Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Ursula Ungaro
Case #: 1:19-cv-21305
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2019
Terminated:Jun 04, 2019
Last checked: Thursday May 23, 2019 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College
Represented By
Alexandra Christine Hayes
Marrero And Wydler, P.A.
contact info
Lourdes Espino Wydler
Marrero & Wydler
contact info
Oscar Edmund Marrero
Marrero & Wydler
contact info
Plaintiff
Theodore Demosthenes Karantsalis
289 Shadow Way
Miami Springs, FL 33166


Docket last updated: 06/23/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 10, 2019
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 1:50 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10:02 AM
Second NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Theodore Demosthenes Karantsalis. (ls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 1:34 PM
ORDER re16 Plaintiffs Notice to Voluntarily Dismiss, All future hearings are CANCELLED and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 06/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 7:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Theodore Demosthenes Karantsalis. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
15 15 motion Dismiss Wed 4:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint by District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College. Responses due by 6/12/2019(Wydler, Lourdes)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10:37 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. (Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/27/2019 Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 05/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
13 13 motion Extension of Time Fri 5:29 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re5 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, by District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College. Responses due by 5/31/2019(Wydler, Lourdes)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 16, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra Christine Hayes on behalf of District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College. Attorney Alexandra Christine Hayes added to party District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College(pty:dft). (Hayes, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lourdes Espino Wydler on behalf of District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College. Attorney Lourdes Espino Wydler added to party District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College(pty:dft). (Wydler, Lourdes)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oscar Edmund Marrero on behalf of District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College. Attorney Oscar Edmund Marrero added to party District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College(pty:dft). (Marrero, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
9 9 2 pgs order Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Tue 4:32 PM
ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 1:47 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re6 Order to Show Cause by Theodore Demosthenes Karantsalis. (drz)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 2:46 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (drz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
6 6 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 3:46 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall show cause in writing as to her efforts in effecting service on Defendant by 5/13/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11:57 AM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/17/2019, Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2019 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 3:47 PM
Summons Issued as to District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College. (drz)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Mon 11:04 AM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 4/8/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100184754. (vt)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 10:48 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10:40 AM
COMPLAINT against District Board of Trustees of Miami Dade College. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number FLS100184754 by Theodore Demosthenes Karantsalis.(cds) Modified on 4/8/2019 (mr1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit