Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Marcia G Cooke
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:19-cv-21319
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2019
Last checked: Thursday May 23, 2019 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
NCL (Bahamas) LTD.
Represented By
Todd L Sussman
Norwegian Cruise Line
contact info
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE ELLEN SUNDBERG
Represented By
Frank D. Butler
Frank D Butler PA
contact info
Kelly Ann LaVelle May
Frank D. Butler, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10:33 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by STEPHANIE ELLEN SUNDBERG (Butler, Frank)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10:11 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by STEPHANIE ELLEN SUNDBERG (Butler, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 4:51 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by NCL (Bahamas) LTD. identifying Corporate Parent NCL International, Ltd., Corporate Parent Arrasas Limited, Corporate Parent Star NCLC Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent NCL Corporation Ltd., Corporate Parent Norwegian Cruise Line Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent AIF VI NCL (AIV), L.P., Corporate Parent AIF VI NCL (AIV II), L.P., Corporate Parent AIF VI NCL (AIV IV), L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Overseas Partners (Delaware) VI, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Overseas Partners (Delaware 892) VI, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Overseas Partners VI, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Overseas Partners (Germany) VI, L.P., Corporate Parent AIF VI Euro Holdings, L.P., Corporate Parent AIF VII Euro Holdings, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Alternative Assets, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Management VI, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Management VII, L.P., Corporate Parent AIF VI NCL (AIV III), L.P., Corporate Parent NCL Athene LLC, Corporate Parent AAA GuarantorCo-Invest VII, L.P. for NCL (Bahamas) LTD. (Sussman, Todd)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 4:46 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by NCL (Bahamas) LTD.. Attorney Todd L Sussman added to party NCL (Bahamas) LTD.(pty:dft). (Sussman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 10:37 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by STEPHANIE ELLEN SUNDBERG. NCL (Bahamas) LTD. served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Butler, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
4 4 15 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 5:58 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 6/10/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 7:44 AM
Summons Issued as to NCL (Bahamas) LTD. (bb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 7:41 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT against NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. a Bermuda Company d/b/a NORWEGIAN CRUISE LINE,. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11540753, filed by STEPHANIE ELLEN SUNDBERG.(Butler, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)