Watts v. Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Charlene Edwards Honeywell |
Referred: | Christopher P Tuite |
Case #: | 8:19-cv-00829 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2019 5:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Appellate Court of State of Illinois
|
|
Defendant
Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois
|
|
Defendant
James P. Flannery, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
John C. Griffin
|
|
Defendant
Michael B. Hyman
|
|
Defendant
Terrence J. Lavin
|
|
Defendant
Mary Anne Mason
|
|
Defendant
Mary L. Mikva
|
|
Defendant
Michael F. Otto
|
|
Defendant
Daniel J. Pierce
|
|
Defendant
Diane M. Shelley
|
|
Defendant
Carl Anthony Walker
|
|
Plaintiff
Gordon Wayne Watts
Plant City, FL 33566
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Mon 07/08 5:33 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment Concurrent with Rule 60 Motion for Relief from a Judgment or Order 16 is DENIED. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/8/2019. (GLP) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Alter Judgment
Wed 06/19 4:14 PM
MOTION to Alter/Amend Judgment concurrent with Rule 60 Motion for Relief from a Judgment or Order by Gordon Wayne Watts. (CTR) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
utility
Acknowledgment - Transferred Case Opened
Fri 05/24 10:53 AM
Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Northern District of Illinois - as case 1:19-cv-03473, filed 05/23/2019. (JNB) |
||
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
transfer
District transfer out
Thu 05/23 9:59 AM
TRANSFER to the Northern District of Illinois. (JNB) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
9
pgs
order
Order transferring case to another division
Wed 05/22 3:52 PM
ORDER: This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Illinois for all further proceedings. The Clerk is hereby directed to immediately transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/22/2019. (JJH) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/15 2:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Appellate Court of State of Illinois, Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, James P. Flannery, Jr, John C. Griffin, Michael B. Hyman, Terrence J. Lavin, Mary Anne Mason, Mary L. Mikva, Michael F. Otto, Daniel J. Pierce, Diane M. Shelley, Carl Anthony Walker filed by Gordon Wayne Watts. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Gordon Wayne Watts.(CTR) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response to order to show cause
Mon 04/15 2:36 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re9 Order to show cause filed by Gordon Wayne Watts. (CTR) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Mon 04/15 2:24 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gordon Wayne Watts. Related case(s): yes (CTR) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Mon 04/15 2:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re8 Interested persons order by Gordon Wayne Watts. (CTR) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
6
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Wed 04/10 2:22 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to the Rooker-Feldman doctrine for lack of subject matter jurisdiction or transferred to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. Plaintiff shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Failure to respond within the time provided will result in dismissal or transfer of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/10/2019. (BGS) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Interested persons order
Tue 04/09 10:43 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/23/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/9/2019. (BGS) |
|
7 | 7
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Tue 04/09 10:42 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/23/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/9/2019. (BGS) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/09 8:29 AM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for leave to File via CM/ECF by Gordon Wayne Watts. (CTR) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 04/09 8:28 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gordon Wayne Watts. (CTR) |
|
4 | 4
motion
File Excess Pages
Tue 04/09 8:27 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess of Twenty-Five Pages by Gordon Wayne Watts. (CTR) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Preliminary injunction
Tue 04/09 8:26 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Gordon Wayne Watts.(CTR) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 8:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gordon Wayne Watts. (CTR) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 8:23 AM
COMPLAINT against Appellate Court of State of Illinois, Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, James P. Flannery, Jr, John C. Griffin, Michael B. Hyman, Terrence J. Lavin, Mary Anne Mason, Mary L. Mikva, Michael F. Otto, Daniel J. Pierce, Diane M. Shelley, Carl Anthony Walker filed by Gordon Wayne Watts.(CTR) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-H, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit L Part 1, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit L Part 2, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet |