J Publication Company
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Donald R Cassling |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-10236 |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2019 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 29, 2019 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 09, 2019 |
Debtor
Johnson Publishing Company, LLC
200 S. Michigan Ave., Suite 900
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
J Publication Company
200 S. Michigan Ave., Suite 900
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Miriam R Stein
Chuhak & Tecson, P.C. 30 S. Wacker Drive Suite 2600
Chicago, IL 60606 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Miriam R. Stein
Gutnicki LLP 4711 Golf Road Suite 200
Skokie, IL 60076 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Represented By
|
1. | Johnson Publishing Co., which started Ebony, Jet magazines, files for bankruptcy (chicago.suntimes.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/10/2019 | |
2. | Johnson Publishing Files for Bankruptcy, Plans to Sell Assets (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/10/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2022 9:57 AM CDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
35
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)
Tue 04/09 3:40 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $335, Filed by Howard L. Adelman on behalf of Johnson Publishing Company, LLC (Adelman, Howard) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Tue 04/09 3:40 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/17/2019 at 12:00 PM at 219 South Dearborn, Office of the U.S. Trustee, 8th Floor, Room 800, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Adelman, Howard) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Tue 04/09 3:45 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 19-10236 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 39492493. Fee Amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
misc
Appearance
Tue 04/09 4:51 PM
Appearance Filed by Steven B Chaiken on behalf of Johnson Publishing Company, LLC. (Chaiken, Steven) |