SMITH et al v. CITY OF GREENSBORO et al
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Loretta C Biggs |
Referred: | Joe L Webster |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00386 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2019 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
ASHLEY ABBOTT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DYLAN ALLING
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LEE ANDREWS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JORDAN BAILEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER BRADSHAW
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CITY OF GREENSBORO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT DUNCAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GUILFORD COUNTY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALFRED LEWIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MICHAEL MONTALVO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JUSTIN PAYNE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOUGLAS STRADER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEORGE SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARY SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
237 | 237
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 12/01 1:01 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 12/01/2022, that all claims that have been asserted in this case are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.(Taylor, Abby) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
236 | 236
misc
Status Report
Wed 11/30 9:09 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by ASHLEY ABBOTT, DYLAN ALLING, LEE ANDREWS, JORDAN BAILEY, CHRISTOPHER BRADSHAW, CITY OF GREENSBORO, A. D., ROBERT DUNCAN, K.S., ALFRED LEWIS, MICHAEL MONTALVO, JUSTIN PAYNE, MARQUIS SMITH, DOUGLAS STRADER.(DUNCAN, ALAN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice | ||
utility
Case Referred to Judge
Wed 11/30 2:38 PM
CASE REFERRED RE:236 Status Report, to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie) |