Gil v. Zimmerman (USA), Inc.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-21357 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2019 5:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Zimmerman (USA), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Carlos Gil
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/20 9:22 AM
NOTICE by Juan Carlos Gil of Filing Order Imposing Sanctions (Dinin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
Wed 08/21 3:31 PM
ORDER APPROVING ENTRY OF THE CONSENT DECREE, approved15 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Thu 08/15 12:12 PM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Juan Carlos Gil. Responses due by 8/29/2019(Dinin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Decree, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 07/17 11:34 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal. The parties shall file a notice or stipulation of dismissal on or before August 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 07/15 6:47 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time To File Stipulation of Dismissal re 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Juan Carlos Gil. Responses due by 7/29/2019(Dinin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 06/14 11:06 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal. The parties shall file a notice or stipulation for dismissal on or before July 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 06/13 9:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal re 10 Administrative Order, by Juan Carlos Gil. Responses due by 6/27/2019(Dinin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Administrative Order
Mon 05/13 4:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER administratively closing case in light of9 Joint Notice of Settlement, which indicates that this matter has settled in full. The parties are hereby notified that on or before June 13, 2019, they must file a Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal and/or Settlement Agreement along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Settlement - aty
Mon 05/13 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Juan Carlos Gil (Dinin, Scott) |
|
utility
~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 05/14 9:22 AM
***Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. per DE 10 (cbr) |
||
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 05/01 5:29 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Defendant, Zimmerman (USA), Inc.'s, Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint and comply with the Court's Notice of court Practice [ECF No. 5] on or before May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 05/01 4:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Zimmerman (USA), Inc.. Attorney Tasos C. Paindiris added to party Zimmerman (USA), Inc. (pty:dft). (Paindiris, Tasos) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/30 2:45 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Juan Carlos Gil. Zimmerman (USA), Inc. served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019.(Dinin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Wed 04/10 5:48 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. The Complaint in this action is filed under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA), 42 U.S.C. §§ 12181 et seq. In order to assist the Court in the management of this case, and in an effort to foster early and cost-effective resolution, the parties are ORDERED as follows: Within fourteen (14) days of service of the Complaint, Defendant shall file a report with the Court indicating whether it intends to remediate the deficiencies identified in the Complaint and agrees to pay reasonable attorneys fees in connection with this action, as determined by the Court or agreement of the parties. If so, Defendant shall include a timeline for remediation. If, upon review of the report, the Court finds that Defendant intends to remediate the property in a timely manner, the Court will administratively close the case pending remediation. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) |
|
4 | 4
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Wed 04/10 5:44 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 1:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Zimmerman (USA), Inc.. (cds) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/10 1:33 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11547009, filed by Juan Carlos Gil.(Dinin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |