LR Trust v. SunTrust Banks, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael L Brown |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01622 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2019 4:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dallas S. Clement
|
|
Defendant
Paul R. Garcia
|
|
Defendant
M. Douglas Ivester
|
|
Defendant
Donna S. Morea
|
|
Defendant
David M. Ratcliffe
|
|
Defendant
William H. Rogers, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Agnes Bundy Scanlan
|
|
Defendant
Frank P. Scruggs, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
SunTrust Banks, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bruce L. Tanner
|
|
Defendant
Steven C. Voorhees
|
|
Defendant
Thomas R. Watjen
|
|
Plaintiff
LR Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Thu 10/24 8:25 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (dob) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 10/24 8:29 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dob) |
||
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/23 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by LR Trust (Rogovin, Michael) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 10/22 8:26 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE on or before November 4, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this matter after November 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/21/2019. (dob) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
13
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 3:15 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt) |
|
1 | 1
30+
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by LR Trust. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8569984)(tmf) |
|
Att: 1 Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |