Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Case #: 1:19-cv-21373
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2019
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2019 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
CIGNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Shari Lyn Gerson
contact info
Shayna Alicia Freyman
Gray Robinson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
GVB MD, LLC.
Represented By
Nicole Marie Martell
Di Pietro Partners
contact info
David DiPietro
Di Pietro Partners, LLP
contact info
Lisandra Estevez
David Di Pietro , Associates, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/20/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 26, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Unavailability Mon 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by GVB MD, LLC. (Martell, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 4:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CIGNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY. (Freyman, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 3:47 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion to dismiss on or before June 11, 2014. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 12:12 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to5 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CIGNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY.(Freyman, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
10 10 respm Response/Reply (Other) Tue 2:38 PM
Plaintiff's RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by GVB MD, LLC.. (Martell, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 4:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before May 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
8 8 motion Extension of Time Wed 4:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time 10 Days by GVB MD, LLC.. Responses due by 5/29/2019(Martell, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shayna Alicia Freyman on behalf of CIGNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY (Freyman, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shayna Alicia Freyman on behalf of CIGNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY. Attorney Shayna Alicia Freyman added to party CIGNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft). (Freyman, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 4:38 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CIGNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY. Attorney Shari Lyn Gerson added to party CIGNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/17/2019(Gerson, Shari)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - NFL Plan,
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" - Miami-Dade Plan,
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" - Key West Plan
Thursday, April 11, 2019
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 11:50 AM
Summons Issued as to CIGNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY. (ebz)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 11:47 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10:28 AM
COMPLAINT against CIGNA HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11549634, filed by David na GVB MD, LLC d/b/a MIAMI BACK AND NECK SPECIALISTS.(Martell, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)