Klein et al v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert N Scola, Jr |
Referred: | Edwin G Torres |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-21390 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 08, 2019 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
|
|
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eli Lilly Industries Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eli Lilly and Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Raquel Klein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael W. Klein
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 07/26 8:45 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Michael W. Klein, Raquel Klein. Eli Lilly Industries Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Eli Lilly and Company served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019.(Modiano, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/09 2:45 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal - aty
Tue 07/09 11:42 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Michael W. Klein, Raquel Klein (Modiano, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Thu 06/27 11:11 AM
Notice Of Upcoming Deadline To Serve Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 4(m); The Plaintiff is notified, in keeping with Rule 4(m), that the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice unless the Plaintiff timely serves the Defendant by July 10, 2019 Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 06/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Thu 04/18 5:02 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc) |
|
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/18 9:14 AM
Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Eli Lilly Industries Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. (ar2) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/12 9:33 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Eli Lilly & Company, Eli Lilly Industries, Inc.,, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11552230, filed by Michael Klein, Raquel Klein.(Modiano, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s) |