Chapman v. Mueller Water Products, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis J Liman |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-03260 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 08, 2019 4:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
Marietta Edmunds Zakas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J. Scott Hall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Evan L. Hart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregory E. Hyland
|
|
Defendant
Mueller Water Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Lead Plaintiff
Andrea Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glen Chapman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
71 | 71
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Thu 06/18 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 5/26/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
70 | 70
misc
Transcript
Thu 06/18 1:30 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 5/26/2020 before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2020 | ||
69 | 69
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 06/12 10:33 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:68 Memorandum & Opinion. in favor of Mueller Water Products, Inc., Evan L. Hart, Gregory E. Hyland, J. Scott Hall, Marietta Edmunds Zakas against Andrea Peterson, Glen Chapman, Kevin Kelly. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated June 11, 2020, Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted with prejudice; Plaintiffs made no request for leave to amend in the SAC or the Opposition, and Plaintiffs did not make such an application at oral argument even when Defendants raised the issue. The dismissal is thus with prejudice; accordingly, this case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 06/12/2020) (dt) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Right to Appeal | ||
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Fri 06/12 10:35 AM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (dt) |
||
Thursday, June 11, 2020 | ||
68 | 68
49
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Thu 06/11 1:41 PM
OPINION & ORDER re:38 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . filed by J. Scott Hall, Evan L. Hart, Marietta Edmunds Zakas, Mueller Water Products, Inc.,57 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint . filed by J. Scott Hall, Evan L. Hart, Marietta Edmunds Zakas, Mueller Water Products, Inc. For the reasons stated herein, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED with prejudice. Plaintiffs made no request for leave to amend in the SAC or the Opposition, and Plaintiffs did not make such an application at oral argument even when Defendants raised the issue. See Hrg Tr. at 33:21-34:24, May 26, 2020. The dismissal is thus with prejudice. See, e.g., Campo, 371 F. Appx at 218; Anatian v. Coutts Bank (Switzerland) Ltd., 193 F.3d 85, 89 (2d Cir. 1999). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. Nos. 38, 57. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/11/2020) (va) |
|
misc
Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk
Thu 06/11 3:32 PM
Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk. Transmitted re:68 Memorandum & Opinion to the Orders and Judgments Clerk. (va) |