Tarradell v. Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Referred: | Alicia M Otazo-Reyes |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-21395 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 09, 2019 4:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blanca Tarradell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 10/11 4:15 PM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re20 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. All pending Motions are Denied as Moot, Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal - aty
Wed 10/09 4:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Blanca Tarradell(Aronfeld, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 09/24 3:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting21 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time of the Deadline to File a Stipulation of Dismissal Pursuant to DE 20. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal on or before October 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/24/2019. (ean) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 09/24 3:03 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time OF THE DEADLINE TO FILE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO DE 20 by Blanca Tarradell. Responses due by 10/8/2019(Aronfeld, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/26 2:39 PM
ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT re19 Notice of Settlement; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) |
|
utility
~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 08/26 2:49 PM
***Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated.per order20 (mr1) |
||
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Settlement - aty
Fri 08/23 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Blanca Tarradell (Aronfeld, Spencer) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 08/12 12:56 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time OF THE PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES by Blanca Tarradell. Responses due by 8/26/2019(Aronfeld, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 06/28 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Spencer Marc Aronfeld (Aronfeld, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 06/27 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Spencer Marc Aronfeld (Aronfeld, Spencer) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 06/04 2:20 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, filed by Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd.. (Fagenson, Rachael) |
|
utility
~Util - Terminate Attorneys
Tue 06/04 3:36 PM
Attorney Raul Gabriel Delgado, II terminated per DE14 . (pes) |
||
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/03 4:56 PM
NOTICE by Blanca Tarradell of Termination of Counsel (Aronfeld, Spencer) |
|
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/03 4:49 PM
ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. REOUIRING M EDIATION. AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO M AGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 5/7/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ( Mediation Deadline 3/12/2020.) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 06/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Fri 05/31 4:04 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd.(Fagenson, Rachael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Election to Jurisdiction | ||
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 05/30 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachael Mitchell Fagenson on behalf of Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd.. Attorney Rachael Mitchell Fagenson added to party Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd.(pty:dft). (Fagenson, Rachael) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/28 12:20 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, filed by Blanca Tarradell. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Aronfeld, Spencer) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/15 11:25 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent NCL International, Ltd., Corporate Parent Arrasas Limited, Corporate Parent Star NCLC Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent NCL Corporation Ltd., Corporate Parent Norwegian Cruise Line Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent AIF VI NCL (AIV), L.P., Corporate Parent AIF VI NCL (AIV II), L.P., Corporate Parent AIF VI NCL (AIV IV), L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Overseas Partners (Delaware) VI, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Overseas Partners (Delaware 892) VI, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Overseas Partners VI, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Overseas Partners (Germany) VI, L.P., Corporate Parent AIF VI Euro Holdings, L.P., Corporate Parent AIF VII Euro Holdings, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Alternative Assets, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Management VI, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Management VII, L.P., Corporate Parent AIF VI NCL (AIV III), L.P., Corporate Parent NCL Athene LLC, Corporate Parent AAA GuarantorCo-Invest VII, L.P. for Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd. (Sussman, Todd) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Tue 05/14 4:54 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, by Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd.. Attorney Todd L Sussman added to party Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd.(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Sussman, Todd) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/25 3:35 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Blanca Tarradell. Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd. served on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (Aronfeld, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 2:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Norwegian (Bahamas) Ltd. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Thu 04/18 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Blanca Tarradell re1 Complaint, filed by Blanca Tarradell (Delgado, Raul) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s) Proposed Summons | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
9
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Tue 04/16 3:10 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
order
Clerks Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES)
Fri 04/12 11:01 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - the image is blank. (jao) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/12 11:00 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 9:55 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY against NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. a Bermuda Company d/b/a NORWEGIAN CRUISE LINE,. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11553072, filed by Blanca Tarradell.(Aronfeld, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons |