Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Ursula Ungaro
Case #: 1:19-cv-21400
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2019
Terminated:May 30, 2019
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2019 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Edible Arrangements, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth Mercedes Rodriguez
Ford & Harrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Windy Lucius
Represented By
Juan Courtney Cunningham
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/17/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 2:40 PM
ORDER granting14 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 11:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Edible Arrangements, LLC(Rodriguez, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 01, 2019
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 11:47 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time (Settlement Papers due 7/9/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
12 12 motion Extension of Time Fri 4:43 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time To Execute Settlement Agreement and File Stipulation of Dismissal re11 Order,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by Edible Arrangements, LLC. Responses due by 7/12/2019(Rodriguez, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 30, 2019
11 11 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 11:50 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES. THE PARTIES are hereby notified that all papers related to the settlement reached between the parties, including any order of dismissal stating specific terms and conditions, must be filed by Friday, June 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 11:47 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Wed 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Edible Arrangements, LLC (Rodriguez, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 3:19 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Edible Arrangements, LLC. (Rodriguez, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 1:53 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. ( Initial Plannig and Scheduling Conference set for 6/14/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) (Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 5/31/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 10:05 AM
ORDER denying5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant SHALL file its response to the complaint no later than Friday, May 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline Thu 10:07 AM
Reset Answer Due Deadline per DE6 Order. Edible Arrangements, LLC response to complaint due 5/10/2019. (ar2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 8:44 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Edible Arrangements, LLC. Attorney Elizabeth Mercedes Rodriguez added to party Edible Arrangements, LLC(pty:dft).(Rodriguez, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 19, 2019
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 1:03 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Windy Lucius. Edible Arrangements, LLC served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 2:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Edible Arrangements, LLC. (ar2)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 2:09 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Edible Arrangements, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11554431, filed by Windy Lucius.(Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet