Le et al v. Chief Immigrant Investor Program Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-21408 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/05 12:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to the parties'16 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal - aty
Wed 08/05 12:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cuc Thi Thu Doan, Trinh Thi Dieu Le, Linzhi Qi, Phuoc Tran (Contreras-Martinez, Carmen) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Mon 12/16 11:49 AM
STATUS REPORT by Chief Immigrant Investor Program Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Homeland Security Secretary, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Pinheiro Schild, Clarissa) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Miscellaneous Case - Closeout
Mon 08/19 3:17 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of the13 Joint Motion to Stay. Either party may move to reopen at any time. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/19/2019. (jdo) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stay
Mon 08/19 2:07 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Chief Immigrant Investor Program Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Homeland Security Secretary, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Responses due by 9/3/2019(Pinheiro Schild, Clarissa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Fri 06/21 2:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Vacate Order. The Court's Notice of Court Practice on Default Procedure 9 is vacated. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) |
|
11 | 11
3
pgs
motion
Vacate
Fri 06/21 2:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 9 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,,, by Chief Immigrant Investor Program Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Homeland Security Secretary, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Pinheiro Schild, Clarissa) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 06/21 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clarissa Pinheiro Schild on behalf of Chief Immigrant Investor Program Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Homeland Security Secretary, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Clarissa Pinheiro Schild added to party Chief Immigrant Investor Program Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Clarissa Pinheiro Schild added to party Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Clarissa Pinheiro Schild added to party Homeland Security Secretary(pty:dft), Attorney Clarissa Pinheiro Schild added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Pinheiro Schild, Clarissa) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Thu 06/20 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE ON DEFAULT PROCEDURE. Plaintiffs effectuated service of the summons and complaint on Defendants on April 18, 2019 [ECF Nos. 5, 6, 7, & 8]. Defendants, however, have failed to plead or otherwise defend this action after being served with process. Accordingly, within five (5) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file for entry of default by the Clerk as to the Defendants. Within ten (10) days of entry of default by the Clerk, Plaintiff shall file a motion for final default judgment, accompanied by a proposed final default judgment attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and duly supported by affidavits and other documentation. Plaintiffs' failure to file a Motion for Final Default Judgment on or before the date set forth above may result in dismissal of the instant action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 05/02 9:32 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Linzhi Qi, Cuc Thi Thu Doan, Trinh Thi Dieu Le, Phuoc Tran. Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Contreras-Martinez, Carmen) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 05/02 9:30 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Linzhi Qi, Cuc Thi Thu Doan, Trinh Thi Dieu Le, Phuoc Tran. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Contreras-Martinez, Carmen) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 05/02 9:27 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Linzhi Qi, Cuc Thi Thu Doan, Trinh Thi Dieu Le, Phuoc Tran. Homeland Security Secretary served on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Contreras-Martinez, Carmen) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 05/02 9:25 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Linzhi Qi, Cuc Thi Thu Doan, Trinh Thi Dieu Le, Phuoc Tran. Chief Immigrant Investor Program Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Contreras-Martinez, Carmen) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Mon 04/15 6:17 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 04/15 9:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Chief Immigrant Investor Program Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Homeland Security Secretary, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (vmz) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/15 9:39 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. (vmz) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus
Fri 04/12 3:59 PM
Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11555294, filed by Linzhi Qi, Cuc Thi Thu Doan, Trinh Thi Dieu Le, Phuoc Tran.(Contreras-Martinez, Carmen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A through D, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) Colucci, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) Cissna, | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s) Nielson, | ||
Att: 6 Summon(s) USCIS |