Gomez v. Miami Hand Center
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert N Scola, Jr |
Referred: | Edwin G Torres |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-21417 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 09, 2019 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Miami Hand Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andres Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 06/27 12:44 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL, Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Wed 06/26 7:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andres Gomez (Leal, Alberto) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 06/18 9:15 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part the Defendant's second unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint in this case10 . The Court previous granted the Defendant at 30 day enlargement. Another 20 days is not appropriate. The Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint in this case is now June 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline
Wed 06/19 9:09 AM
Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Miami Hand Center response due 6/27/2019. per DE 12 (cbr) |
||
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Thu 06/13 3:17 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re10 MOTION for Extension of Time Twenty Days to Respond . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. AND Document Not Linked ; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 06/13 2:24 PM
Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Miami Hand Center. Responses due by 6/27/2019 (Villasante, Roberto) Modified Relief/Link on 6/13/2019 (ls) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 05/13 2:05 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendant's unopposed motion for enlargement of time to respond to the complaint8 . The Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint in this case is now June 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline
Tue 05/14 9:01 AM
Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Miami Hand Center response due 6/13/2019. per DE 9 (cbr) |
||
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 05/10 12:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Miami Hand Center. Attorney Roberto Villasante added to party Miami Hand Center(pty:dft). (Villasante, Roberto) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 04/24 9:54 AM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 4:13 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Andres Gomez. Miami Hand Center served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Leal, Alberto) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Response/Reply (Other)
Fri 04/19 7:23 PM
First RESPONSE To order requiring certificate of counsel regarding any prior filings made under the ADA by Andres Gomez. (Leal, Alberto) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/19 11:04 AM
ORDER REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED STATEMENT IN ADA CASE, AND ORDER REFERRING NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY MATTERS TOTHE MAGISTRATE JUDGE, referring case to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 9:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Miami Hand Center. (mee) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/15 9:08 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 10:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Miami Hand Center. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11556272, filed by Andres Gomez.(Leal, Alberto) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |