Weber v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-21425 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2019 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Weber
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/26 10:10 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice pursuant to12 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal - aty
Wed 07/24 4:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Michael Weber(Jessup, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Administrative Order
Tue 06/11 9:57 PM
ENDORSED ORDER administratively closing case in light of10 Joint Notice of Settlement, which indicates that this matter has settled in full. The parties are hereby notified that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, they must file a Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal and/or Settlement Agreement along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Settlement - aty
Tue 06/11 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by Michael Weber (Jessup, Stephen) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/24 2:09 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Other Affiliate Cigna Holding Company, Other Affiliate Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate Cigna Holdings, Inc. for Life Insurance Company of North America (Gerson, Shari) |
|
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Fri 05/24 2:07 PM
ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before June 14, 2019 , the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates. Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (lfn) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/24 2:03 PM
Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Gerson, Shari) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 05/06 9:58 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's Response shall be filed on or before May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 05/03 5:15 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney Shari Lyn Gerson added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft).(Gerson, Shari) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Mon 04/15 6:19 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 1:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (jao) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/15 1:36 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11557601, filed by Michael Weber.(Jessup, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |