Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Marcia G Cooke
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:19-cv-21438
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2019 1:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Pittsfield Hotel Inc.
a foreign corporation, c/o Monika K. David 2408 N. Kedzie Blvd.
Chicago, IL 60647
Plaintiff
Jesus Gonzalez
an individual, c/o Law Offices of Nolan Klein, P.A. 1 East Broward Blvd., Ste. 1500
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Hector Virgilio Ramirez
Law Offices Of Nolan Klein, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, April 19, 2019
4 4 9 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 11:51 AM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 6/19/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 7:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Pittsfield Hotel Inc. (bb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 7:31 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 6:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Pittsfield Hotel Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11560289, filed by Jesus Gonzalez.(Ramirez, Hector)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)