CWNEVADA LLC
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mike K Nakagawa |
Case #: | 2:19-bk-12300 |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2019 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 16, 2019 |
Claims Deadline: | Aug 14, 2019 |
Dismissed: | Jun 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
CWNEVADA LLC
4145 W Ali Baba Ln Ste A
Las Vegas, NV 89118-1654 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101 |
1. | CWNevada cannabis company files for Chapter 11 (reviewjournal.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/18/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 59 seconds ago |
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
92 | 92
court
Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 11 and Split/Transfer/Dismissed only)
Wed 06/19 8:40 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ccc) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
91 | 91
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 06/13 2:18 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (ccc) |