Baboolal v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Bloom |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-60983 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2019 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Baboolal
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 05/15 1:16 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Tue 05/14 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Raymond Baboolal (Jessup, Stephen) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 05/10 4:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America by 5/28/2019. Re:1 Complaint filed by Raymond Baboolal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 05/10 4:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney Stefanie M. Mederos added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft).(Mederos, Stefanie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/25 1:16 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Raymond Baboolal. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Jessup, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 04/17 4:56 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 10:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (ebz) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/17 10:24 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 9:37 AM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11564651, filed by Raymond Baboolal.(Jessup, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |