Maria Guadalupe Sanchez De Ramirez v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 5:19-cv-00704 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
order
Attorney Fees
Fri 02/24 5:50 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting30 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Statement (Motion related)
Thu 01/26 8:37 AM
STATEMENT of Commissioners Non-Party Analysis of Plaintiffs Counsels 406(b) Fee Request / NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 USC Sec. 406(b) 30 filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 01/19 1:20 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event and text content. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 01/18 10:56 AM
(Attorney Paul H. Sachelari added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 01/12 3:47 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re: MOTION for Attorney Fees30 . Defendant is directed to file a response to the Motion within fourteen (14) days. Plaintiff's counsel may file a reply to defendant's response within seven (7) days of service thereof. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 01/11 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 USC Sec. 406(b) filed by Plaintiff Maria G.S.D.R. (Koenig, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A - SSA Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment B-Fee Agreement | ||
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Wed 06/10 2:24 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act in the amount of FOUR-THOUSAND NINE-HUNDRED EIGHTY-SEVEN DOLLARS and 58 CENTS ($4,987.58), as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), and Court costs in the amount of FOUR-HUNDRED DOLLARS and NO CENTS ($400.00), pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920, subject to the terms of the Stipulation.28 (es) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Tue 06/09 4:42 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $4,987.58. and Costs in the amount of $400.00 filed by Plaintiff Maria G.S.D.R.(Koenig, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/08 9:55 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-704 JC on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Saturday, June 06, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Sat 06/06 4:05 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Koenig, Andrew) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 06/03 11:43 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations24 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is REVERSED AND THIS MATTER IS REMANDED for further administrative action consistent with the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (et) |
|
24 | 24
order
R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
Wed 06/03 11:41 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips for Report and Recommendation (Issued)23 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that (1) the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is reversed and the matter is remanded for further administrative action consistent with the Report and Recommendation; and (2) Judgment be entered accordingly. (et) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Issued)
Mon 05/11 5:49 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that the District Judge issue an Order: (1) approving and accepting this Report and Recommendation; (2) reversing the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security and remanding this matter for further administrative action consistent with this Report and Recommendation;6 and (3) directing that judgment be entered accordingly.14 19 . (es) |
|
Att: 1 Prop O&J | ||
22 | 22
reportrecommend
Notice of Report and Recommendation
Mon 05/11 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND THE LODGING OF PROPOSED ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Objections to R&R due by 5/25/2020. (es) |
|
Att: 1 Report and Recommendation, | ||
Att: 2 Prop O&J | ||
21 | 21
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 05/11 2:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER SUBSTITUTING CURRENT COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION AS DEFENDANT by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: Pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration, is hereby substituted in as the defendant in this action. (es) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 01/06 1:47 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#19-102) approved by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that the following cases be reassigned from the calendar of Judge Manuel L. Real to the calendar of Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00704 VAP(JC). (rn) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 12/09 5:48 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/13 12:47 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until December 9, 2019 to file a motion for summary judgment or remand. re17 (sbou) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 11/08 12:47 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 10/03 12:29 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Based upon the parties Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until November 8, 2019 to file a motion for summary judgment or remand. re15 (sbou) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 10/01 5:29 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 09/11 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or Remand filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Sanc De Ramirez. (Koenig, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A - SCO pages | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/24 2:31 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. IT IS ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall have an extension of thirty-five (35) days, or until September 13, 2019, to file her motion for summary judgment or remand and that all other briefing deadlines set forth in the Courts April 17, 2019 Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly.12 (et) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 07/23 7:55 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Sanc De Ramirez.(Koenig, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Administrative Record (Social Security)
Wed 07/10 8:23 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (SOCIAL SECURITY) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 07/10 8:16 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Tue 05/28 10:41 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Amanda Schapel added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Wed 05/08 12:10 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Sanc De Ramirez, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/8/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Deborah L. Stachel, Regional Chief Counsel, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel-Region IX. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Koenig, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 04/17 4:38 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. This case is designated for electronic filing. See Local Rule 5-4. When a proposed order or other proposed document is lodged or accompanies a filing, a WordPerfect or Word copy of the proposed order or other proposed document shall also be e-mailed to: JC_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. (See document for details.) (sbou) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/17 3:55 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Wed 04/17 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 04/17 1:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Sanc De Ramirez. (Koenig, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/17 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Sanc De Ramirez, identifying Joe Solomon. (Koenig, Andrew) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Wed 04/17 1:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Sanc De Ramirez. (Koenig, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/17 1:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23567129 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Sanc De Ramirez. (Attorney Andrew Thomas Koenig added to party Maria Guadalupe Sanc De Ramirez(pty:pla))(Koenig, Andrew) |