Gayle et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Pauley, III |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-03451 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332nr Diversity: Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Re-opened: | May 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2019 5:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 50
|
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leona Rhett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle O'Bremski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Meidl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Gayle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Dorsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pearly Coleman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norma Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arnold Buonamano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Axelrod
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shenna Albert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mara Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cherry Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tommie A. Rhett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Meidl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacquelyn Lovett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tawnya Lockhart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christie Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorothy Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlie Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carletha Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosalie Buonamano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Axelrod
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 06/02 12:58 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to40 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Michelle O'Bremski, Cheryl Dorsey, Sharon Stewart, Arnold Buonamano, Leona Rhett, Tommie A. Rhett, Rosalie Buonamano, Pearly Coleman, Ronnie Scott, Bryan Axelrod, Laura Flores, Edward Meidl, Christie Kelly, Tammy Axelrod, Carol Meidl, Dorothy Jones, Tawnya Lockhart, Mara Scott, Cherry Richardson, Carletha Foster, Jacquelyn Lovett, Norma Clark, Charlie Johnson, Barbara Gayle, Shenna Albert. USCA Case Number 20-1383 . UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 06/02/2021..(nd) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Wed 06/02 12:58 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:43 USCA Mandate,,,..(nd) |
||
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Internet Citation
Fri 02/19 12:15 PM
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:35 Memorandum & Opinion. (sjo) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Internet Citation
Fri 02/19 12:14 PM
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:35 Memorandum & Opinion. (sjo) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 04/21 2:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from35 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Shenna Albert, Bryan Axelrod, Rosalie Buonamano, Laura Flores, Carletha Foster, Charlie Johnson, Dorothy Jones, Christie Kelly, Tawnya Lockhart, Jacquelyn Lovett, Edward Meidl, Tommie A. Rhett, Cherry Richardson, Mara Scott, Ronnie Scott, Tammy Axelrod, Arnold Buonamano, Norma Clark, Pearly Coleman, Cheryl Dorsey, Barbara Gayle, Carol Meidl, Michelle O'Bremski, Leona Rhett, Sharon Stewart. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19520415. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Altman, Keith) |
|
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 04/21 5:24 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:40 Notice of Appeal. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Tue 04/21 5:24 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for40 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michelle O'Bremski, Cheryl Dorsey, Sharon Stewart, Arnold Buonamano, Leona Rhett, Tommie A. Rhett, Rosalie Buonamano, Pearly Coleman, Ronnie Scott, Bryan Axelrod, Laura Flores, Edward Meidl, Christie Kelly, Tammy Axelrod, Carol Meidl, Dorothy Jones, Tawnya Lockhart, Mara Scott, Cherry Richardson, Carletha Foster, Jacquelyn Lovett, Norma Clark, Charlie Johnson, Barbara Gayle, Shenna Albert were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(tp) |
||
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 04/13 12:53 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: In accordance with the Parties' August 7, 2019 Joint Status Update and Proposed Case Management Plan and prior agreement, the undersigned Parties stipulate that the claims of Plaintiff Michelle O'Bremski are dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) nunc pro tunc as of August 7, 2019, without prejudice to her right to proceed in the New York Supreme Court for New York County, and as further specified in this Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. So ordered. Michelle O'Bremski terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/13/2020) (rjm) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 04/09 2:07 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:35 Memorandum & Opinion. in favor of Pfizer Inc. against Arnold Buonamano, Barbara Gayle, Bryan Axelrod, Carletha Foster, Carol Meidl, Charlie Johnson, Cherry Richardson, Cheryl Dorsey, Christie Kelly, Dorothy Jones, Edward Meidl, Jacquelyn Lovett, Laura Flores, Leona Rhett, Mara Scott, Michelle O'Bremski, Norma Clark, Pearly Coleman, Ronnie Scott, Rosalie Buonamano, Sharon Stewart, Shenna Albert, Tammy Axelrod, Tawnya Lockhart, Tommie A. Rhett. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons set forth in the Court's Opinion and Order dated April 7, 2020, Pfizer's motion for judgment on the pleadings dismissing this action is granted and the case is dismissed with prejudice; accordingly, this case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 04/09/2020) (dt) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Right to Appeal | ||
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/09 12:02 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Michelle O'Bremski pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Pfizer Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Passaretti, Rachel) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/09 12:16 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 37 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge William H. Pauley, III for approval for the following reason(s): the defendant(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp) |
||
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Thu 04/09 2:10 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (dt) |
||
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 04/08 11:31 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Pfizer Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Pfizer Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Cheffo, Mark) Modified on 4/8/2020 (tp) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 04/08 5:17 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Cheffo, Mark. RE-FILE Document No. 36 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned wet signature image) PDF. (tp) |
||
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
16
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 04/07 12:31 PM
OPINION & ORDER re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Judgement on the Pleadings : For the foregoing reasons, Pfizer's motion for judgment on the pleadings dismissing this action is granted and the case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 21 and mark this case closed. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/7/2020) (jwh) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Wed 01/15 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 12/13/2019 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Transcript
Wed 01/15 4:11 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: motion held on 12/13/2019 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Thu 01/02 12:38 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Lincoln Davis Wilson dated January 2, 2020 re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Judgement on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Pfizer Inc.. (Wilson, Lincoln) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 12/23 9:11 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Judgement on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Shenna Albert, Bryan Axelrod, Rosalie Buonamano, Laura Flores, Carletha Foster, Charlie Johnson, Dorothy Jones, Christie Kelly, Tawnya Lockhart, Jacquelyn Lovett, Edward Meidl, Tommie A. Rhett, Cherry Richardson, Mara Scott, Ronnie Scott, Tammy Axelrod, Arnold Buonamano, Norma Clark, Pearly Coleman, Cheryl Dorsey, Barbara Gayle, Carol Meidl, Michelle O'Bremski, Leona Rhett, Sharon Stewart.(Altman, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 12/16 6:27 PM
RESPONSE in Support of Motion re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Judgement on the Pleadings . Submitted pursuant to the Court's December 13, 2019 bench order . Document filed by Pfizer Inc..(Cheffo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Approval Package | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/16 5:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mara Caitlin Cusker Gonzalez on behalf of Pfizer Inc.. (Cusker Gonzalez, Mara) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
minutes
Oral Argument
Tue 01/07 2:37 PM
|
||
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 11/13 4:10 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Judgement on the Pleadings . and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to Amend Complaint . Document filed by Pfizer Inc..(Cheffo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Wed 10/30 5:51 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Judgement on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Shenna Albert, Bryan Axelrod, Rosalie Buonamano, Laura Flores, Carletha Foster, Charlie Johnson, Dorothy Jones, Christie Kelly, Tawnya Lockhart, Jacquelyn Lovett, Edward Meidl, Tommie A. Rhett, Cherry Richardson, Mara Scott, Ronnie Scott, Tammy Axelrod, Arnold Buonamano, Norma Clark, Pearly Coleman, Cheryl Dorsey, Barbara Gayle, Carol Meidl, Michelle O'Bremski, Leona Rhett, Sharon Stewart.(Altman, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/04 4:16 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT PFIZER'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by Plaintiffs and Defendants, by and through their respective, undersigned counsel, and do hereby stipulate and agree to a fourteen (14) day extension of time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant Pfizer's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. #21 and #22), making the new filing deadline October 30, 2019, for Plaintiff to file his opposition to Defendant Pfizer's motion. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED that Defendant Pfizer's reply is extended by 14 days, making the new filing deadline November 13, 2019. This extension will not require the Court to adjust the hearing date that is currently set for December 13, 2019, should the Court wish to keep that date. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to21 MOTION to Dismiss for Judgement on the Pleadings : Responses due by 10/30/2019, Replies due by 11/13/2019.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/4/2019) (jwh) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Proposed Stipulation and Order
Fri 10/04 12:25 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Shenna Albert, Bryan Axelrod, Rosalie Buonamano, Laura Flores, Carletha Foster, Charlie Johnson, Dorothy Jones, Christie Kelly, Tawnya Lockhart, Jacquelyn Lovett, Edward Meidl, Tommie A. Rhett, Cherry Richardson, Mara Scott, Ronnie Scott, Tammy Axelrod, Arnold Buonamano, Norma Clark, Pearly Coleman, Cheryl Dorsey, Barbara Gayle, Carol Meidl, Michelle O'Bremski, Leona Rhett, Sharon Stewart. (Altman, Keith) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
discov
Rule 26 Disclosure
Mon 09/23 2:28 PM
RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Shenna Albert, Bryan Axelrod, Rosalie Buonamano, Laura Flores, Carletha Foster, Charlie Johnson, Dorothy Jones, Christie Kelly, Tawnya Lockhart, Jacquelyn Lovett, Edward Meidl, Tommie A. Rhett, Cherry Richardson, Mara Scott, Ronnie Scott, Tammy Axelrod, Arnold Buonamano, Norma Clark, Pearly Coleman, Cheryl Dorsey, Barbara Gayle, Carol Meidl, Michelle O'Bremski, Leona Rhett, Sharon Stewart.(Altman, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/17 5:18 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Bernadette Passaretti on behalf of Pfizer Inc.. (Passaretti, Rachel) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
25
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Mon 09/16 5:04 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Judgement on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Pfizer Inc.. (Passaretti, Rachel) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss
Mon 09/16 5:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Judgement on the Pleadings . Document filed by Pfizer Inc..(Passaretti, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Thu 08/22 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 7/17/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Transcript
Thu 08/22 11:19 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 7/17/2019 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 08/13 11:36 AM
ORDER: This Court having reviewed the parties' joint status report dated August 7, 2019 (ECF No. 17), this Court adopts the following schedule: 1. Defendants shall file any motion for judgment on the pleadings by September 16, 2019. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition by October 16, 2019. Defendants shall file any reply by October 30, 2019. The parties shall appear for oral argument on December 13, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. 2. The parties shall serve initial disclosures by September 16, 2019. In addition, the conference scheduled for August 14, 2019 is adjourned sine die. (Motions due by 9/16/2019. Responses due by 10/16/2019. Replies due by 10/30/2019. Oral Argument set for 12/13/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/13/2019) (jwh) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/07 6:23 PM
STATUS REPORT. and [PROPOSED] Case Management Plan Document filed by Pfizer Inc..(Cheffo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 07/18 5:31 PM
ORDER: The parties having appeared for a status conference on July 17, 2019, this Court adopts the following schedule: 1. The parties are directed to file a joint status update by August 7, 2019 setting forth their plan for litigating this matter. 2. The parties are directed to appear for a conference on August 14, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Status Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 01:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/18/2019) (jwh) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 08/01 10:05 AM
|
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/25 11:12 AM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting14 Motion for Keith L. Altman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2019) (jwh) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/24 3:08 PM
MOTION for Keith L. Altman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Shenna Albert, Bryan Axelrod, Rosalie Buonamano, Laura Flores, Carletha Foster, Charlie Johnson, Dorothy Jones, Christie Kelly, Tawnya Lockhart, Jacquelyn Lovett, Edward Meidl, Tommie A. Rhett, Cherry Richardson, Mara Scott, Ronnie Scott, Tammy Axelrod, Arnold Buonamano, Norma Clark, Pearly Coleman, Cheryl Dorsey, Barbara Gayle, Carol Meidl, Michelle O'Bremski, Leona Rhett, Sharon Stewart.(Altman, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/24 9:45 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 11 MOTION for Keith L. Altman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17097686. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 1) Motion was not signed; 2) wrong case number on Proposed Order; 3) missing Certificates of Good Standing from Supreme Courts of California and Michigan; and 4) missing Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - see Local Rule 1.3. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit/Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jcu) |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Mon 06/24 3:12 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 14 MOTION for Keith L. Altman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) |
||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/19 11:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lincoln Wilson on behalf of Pfizer Inc.. (Wilson, Lincoln) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 06/19 11:06 AM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The conference is adjourned to July 17, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/19/2019) (rro) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/17 3:18 PM
MOTION for Keith L. Altman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17097686. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Shenna Albert, Bryan Axelrod, Rosalie Buonamano, Laura Flores, Carletha Foster, Charlie Johnson, Dorothy Jones, Christie Kelly, Tawnya Lockhart, Jacquelyn Lovett, Edward Meidl, Tommie A. Rhett, Cherry Richardson, Mara Scott, Ronnie Scott, Tammy Axelrod, Arnold Buonamano, Norma Clark, Pearly Coleman, Cheryl Dorsey, Barbara Gayle, Carol Meidl, Michelle O'Bremski, Leona Rhett, Sharon Stewart.(Altman, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/17 12:32 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Keith L Altman, Esquire dated 06/17/2019. Document filed by Shenna Albert, Bryan Axelrod, Rosalie Buonamano, Laura Flores, Carletha Foster, Charlie Johnson, Dorothy Jones, Christie Kelly, Tawnya Lockhart, Jacquelyn Lovett, Edward Meidl, Tommie A. Rhett, Cherry Richardson, Mara Scott, Ronnie Scott, Tammy Axelrod, Arnold Buonamano, Norma Clark, Pearly Coleman, Cheryl Dorsey, Barbara Gayle, Carol Meidl, Michelle O'Bremski, Leona Rhett, Sharon Stewart.(Altman, Keith) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/17 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keith L Altman on behalf of Shenna Albert, Bryan Axelrod, Rosalie Buonamano, Laura Flores, Carletha Foster, Charlie Johnson, Dorothy Jones, Christie Kelly, Tawnya Lockhart, Jacquelyn Lovett, Edward Meidl, Tommie A. Rhett, Cherry Richardson, Mara Scott, Ronnie Scott, Tammy Axelrod, Arnold Buonamano, Norma Clark, Pearly Coleman, Cheryl Dorsey, Barbara Gayle, Carol Meidl, Michelle O'Bremski, Leona Rhett, Sharon Stewart. (Altman, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/12 9:09 AM
ORDER: This Court having reviewed Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal (ECF No. 6) and Defendants' opposition to that notice (ECF No. 7), the parties are directed to appear for astatus conference on June 26, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. Defendants are directed to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiffs. (Status Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/11/2019) (cf) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 06/05 10:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Ari Kresch. RE-FILE Document No. 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Respnsive Pleading filed by Pfizer Inc., Re-file the document after changing title of document to Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, and having both parties attorneys sign the Stipualtion, using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. Ari Kresch was e-mailed at the address on the Notice of Voluntary dismissal Doc. #6, because there was never a Notice of Appearance filed, so neither her as the attorney who signed the notice or Mr. Keith Altman who filed the Notice would get notification of the error. (dt) |
||
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Tue 06/04 6:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Notice of Dismissal . Document filed by Pfizer Inc..(Cheffo, Mark) |
|
Saturday, May 11, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Sat 05/11 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Does 1 through 50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc.. Document filed by Mara Scott, Jacquelyn Lovett, Carol Meidl, Norma Clark, Charlie Johnson, Sharon Stewart, Barbara Gayle, Tawnya Lockhart, Cherry Richardson, Shenna Albert, Bryan Axelrod, Arnold Buonamano, Michelle O'Bremski, Laura Flores, Christie Kelly, Ronnie Scott, Cheryl Dorsey, Tommie A. Rhett, Tammy Axelrod, Edward Meidl, Dorothy Jones, Carletha Foster, Leona Rhett, Pearly Coleman, Rosalie Buonamano. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (Altman, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
utility
Case Declined as Not Related
Tue 04/23 12:09 PM
CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 19-3431 and declined by Judge Jesse M Furman and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Tue 04/23 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/23 12:11 PM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (wb) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/19 7:07 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Pfizer Inc..(Cheffo, Mark) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/19 10:45 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/19 10:46 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Fri 04/19 10:46 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 19cv3431 (pc) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/18 3:51 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pfizer Inc..(Cheffo, Mark) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Thu 04/18 3:48 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-3431. Document filed by Pfizer Inc..(Cheffo, Mark) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/18 3:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cheffo, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/18 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York. Case Number: 153851/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16725480).Document filed by Pfizer Inc..(Cheffo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Court Docket |