Drover-Mundy et al v. Fisher-Price, Inc. et al
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Geoffrey Crawford |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00512 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2019 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Fisher-Price, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mattel, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Drover
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Drover-Mundy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Mundy
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Terminated: 06/26/2019
|
1. | Fisher Price faces class action lawsuits for Rock N Play Sleeper deaths (wivb.com) |
Submitted Tue 04/23/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
utility
E-Filing Notification
Tue 03/05 10:24 AM
E-Filing Notification: Clerk spread document (329 in 19-MD-2903) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney as to Katherine G. Howard to all Associated Cases. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF) |
||
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
307 | 307
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Tue 03/05 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney: Katherine G. Howard no longer appearing for Plaintiffs Emily Barton, Luke Cuddy, Candace Kimmel, Cassandra Mulvey, Mark Nabong, Daniel Pasternacki, Katharine Shaffer. (Connors, Terrence) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00512-GWC et al. (JHF) |