Richemont International SA et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Z Lee |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-02640 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2019 3:23 AM CDT |
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
|
|
Defendant
Robert Abney
|
|
Defendant
Sandy Barrett
|
|
Defendant
Susan Barton
|
|
Defendant
Steve Boatright
|
|
Defendant
Leora Burns
|
|
Defendant
Levi Burris
|
|
Defendant
Zandra Coleman
|
|
Defendant
Tara Delisle
|
|
Defendant
William Ewing
|
|
Defendant
Rachelle Fallon
|
|
Defendant
Scott Gates
|
|
Defendant
Steve Gavin
|
|
Defendant
Michael Green
|
|
Defendant
Robert Hinkle
|
|
Defendant
Rodolfo Hoffman
|
|
Defendant
Tanya Hollis
|
|
Defendant
Xie Yu Hong
|
|
Defendant
Lucy Jobs
|
|
Defendant
Peggy Lear
|
|
Defendant
Uriel Lee
|
|
Defendant
Xiongai Long
|
|
Defendant
Linda D. Lu
|
|
Defendant
Stewart Luo
|
|
Defendant
Shirley Marks
|
|
Defendant
Li Nan Nan
|
|
Defendant
Michael Needham
|
|
Defendant
Paul Oldham
|
|
Defendant
Yvonne Pearsall
|
|
Defendant
Rick Price
|
|
Defendant
Robert Sanders
|
|
Defendant
Mitchell Small
|
|
Defendant
Timothy Sutton
|
|
Defendant
Lin Yue
|
|
Defendant
livesaintly.com
|
|
Defendant
lovebrandbagg.com
|
|
Defendant
luxejewelry1.com
|
|
Defendant
luxurypens.net
|
|
Defendant
luxurywatchlove.com
|
|
Defendant
mall-watch.com
|
|
Defendant
mbpens.org
|
|
Defendant
menswatchesuk.top
|
|
Defendant
mesclih.com
|
|
Defendant
mina-ballet.com
|
|
Defendant
montblanc-outlet.top
|
|
Defendant
montblancfountainpens.us.com
|
|
Defendant
montblancinstrument.com
|
|
Defendant
mydreamconnect.org
|
|
Defendant
mywatcheshut.com
|
|
Defendant
newhellojewelry.com
|
|
Defendant
newvoguejewelry.com
|
|
Defendant
ntlyjx.com
|
|
Defendant
omegawatches.us.org
|
|
Defendant
panerai.kuvarsitwatch.io
|
|
Defendant
pingreplicabags.com
|
|
Defendant
plumbinglubbocktx.com
|
|
Defendant
religionandpluralism.org
|
|
Defendant
replica-watch.site
|
|
Defendant
replicabagsmarket.com
|
|
Defendant
replicahandbagcollection.com
|
|
Defendant
replicainseason.com
|
|
Defendant
replicamarketonline.com
|
|
Defendant
replicasalesstore.com
|
|
Defendant
replicasbagshop.com
|
|
Defendant
replicasbagsstore.com
|
|
Defendant
replicasdiscount.com
|
|
Defendant
replicasonlinesale.com
|
|
Defendant
replicasshooping.com
|
|
Defendant
replicawatchessaleonline.site
|
|
Defendant
rolex-replica.us.com
|
|
Defendant
seereplicahandbags.com
|
|
Defendant
sgluxs.online
|
|
Defendant
stonebulletmusic.com
|
|
Defendant
swisswatchsale.com
|
|
Defendant
templebethelquincy.org
|
|
Defendant
theffflife.com
|
|
Defendant
topcartel.com
|
|
Defendant
toplovebracelet.com
|
|
Defendant
trustystores.com
|
|
Defendant
usfashionline.com
|
|
Defendant
vacances-provence-alpes.com
|
|
Defendant
watch100.com
|
|
Defendant
watches-mall.com
|
|
Defendant
watchesfakeshop.com
|
|
Defendant
watchfakes.com
|
|
Defendant
watchhots.com
|
|
Defendant
watchreplication.store
|
|
Defendant
yasalambillymoon.com
|
|
Defendant
zrfashionshop.com
|
|
Plaintiff
Cartier International A.G.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chloe S.A.S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Montblanc-Simplo GMBH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Officine Panerai A.G.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richemont International SA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Van Cleef & Arpels SA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
AliseJewelry Store
Terminated: 06/26/2019
|
|
Defendant
FragranceXofficial
Terminated: 05/28/2019
|
|
Defendant
Youjing 6015 Store
Terminated: 06/26/2019
|
|
Defendant
baiduqiandu Official Store
Terminated: 06/26/2019
|
|
Defendant
fzeroinestore
Terminated: 06/26/2019
|
|
Defendant
weimanjewelry store
Terminated: 06/26/2019
|
Docket last updated: 08/14/2020 1:51 PM CDT |