Jordan v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | John R Tunheim |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01055 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2019 3:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corp Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Merck & Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Jordan
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Terminated: 09/09/2019
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development
Terminated: 09/09/2019
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Terminated: 09/09/2019
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 10/04 10:03 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/4/2019. (HAZ) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Thu 09/12 10:29 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re12 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Solow, Andrew) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 09/09 3:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule FRCP 41 by Bayer Corp Inc, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Merck & Co., Inc.. (Solow, Andrew) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Linda Jordan (Altman, Keith) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Show Cause
Mon 08/19 3:34 PM
ORDER granting (857) Motion for Order to Show Cause in case 0:15-md-02642-JRT. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/19/2019. Associated Cases: 0:15-md-02642-JRT et al.(HAZ) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Show Cause
Mon 08/19 1:34 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Bayer Corp Inc, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Merck & Co., Inc..(Solow, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 BAYER AND MERCK DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 18, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT A CLAIMS THAT HAVE FAILED TO COMPLY WITH PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 18, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT B - DECLARATION OF ANDREW K. SOLOW IN SUPPORT OF BAYER AND MERCK DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 18, | ||
Att: 4 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate L.R. 7.1(F) WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE REGARDING BAYER AND MERCK DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 18 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/19 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Keith Solow on behalf of Bayer Corp Inc, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Merck & Co., Inc..(Solow, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 08/09 10:04 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Jordan. Merck & Co., Inc. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Altman, Keith) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 08/09 10:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Jordan. Bayer Corp Inc waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Altman, Keith) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Protective Order
Fri 04/19 10:53 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/25/2016. (CLK) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel to Comply with Pretrial Orders in Main MDL Case
Fri 04/19 10:52 AM
(Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Fluoroquinolone Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2642 (JRT) . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2642-JRT . Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Fluoroquinolone MDL website at:[LINK:http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Fluoroquinolone/index.shtml] . (CLK) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corp Inc, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Janssen Research & Development, Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Merck & Co., Inc. (CLK) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 04/19 10:33 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list. Please use case number 19-cv-1055 JRT. (CLK) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT against BAYER PHARMA AG, Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company, McKesson Corporation, Merk & Co., Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6817854) filed by Linda Jordan. Filer requests summons issued. (Altman, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |