Roor International BV et al v. Rawy FL, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Byron |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:19-cv-00746 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2019 4:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Rawy FL, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rawy Rayan
|
|
Plaintiff
Roor International BV
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sream, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Thu 08/15 10:53 AM
Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (RDO) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Order of Dismissal | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/14 3:12 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/14/2019. (GNB) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Mon 07/29 2:42 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Roor International BV and Sream, Inc. Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why the Complaint against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m). Failure to respond to this Order may result in dismissal of this case as to said Defendants without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/29/2019. (GNB) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/25 3:07 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-746-ORL-40-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 05/01 4:58 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV; Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj for Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 05/01 4:57 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Interested persons order
Mon 04/22 1:43 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/22/2019. (GNB) |
|
5 | 5
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Mon 04/22 1:42 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/22/2019. (GNB) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Mon 04/22 12:49 PM
Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (RDO) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Mon 04/22 12:40 PM
SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants.(RDO) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 3:11 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-746-Orl-40TBS. (SJB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 2:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15374790) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Sasson, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons |