Burch v. Aurzada
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Referred: | David L Horan |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00948 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2019 3:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Areya Holder Aurzada
|
|
Plaintiff
William Paul Burch
P.O. Box 201236
Arlington, TX 76006 |
Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago |
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Mon 05/13 3:10 PM
JUDGMENT: This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, andDECREED that this action is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/13/2019) (aaa) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Mon 05/13 3:08 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING4 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/13/2019) (aaa) |
|
Sunday, May 12, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Withdraw
Sun 05/12 10:19 PM
Final MOTION to Withdraw4 Findings and Recommendations on Case re:3 Complaint,, filed by William Paul Burch. Motion to Withdraw Petition filed by William Paul Burch (Burch, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Tue 04/30 4:31 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this action without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(h)(3). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/30/2019) (mla) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 7:50 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Areya Holder Aurzada filed by William Paul Burch. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Fri 04/19 7:47 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Scholer
Fri 04/19 7:47 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) |