RUBINSTEIN v. Weight Loss Products, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Naomi Reice Buchwald |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-03641 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2019 4:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Weight Loss Products, LLC
310 46th Ave N
Saint Petersburg, FL 33703 |
|
Defendant
Beth Golden
310 46th Ave N
Saint Petersburg, FL 33703 |
|
Plaintiff
Chaim Rubinstein
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Sunday, May 12, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Sun 05/12 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Beth Golden, Weight Loss Products, LLC. Document filed by Chaim Rubinstein. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (Schlachet, Mark) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 05/09 12:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Beth Golden, Weight Loss Products, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Chaim Rubinstein. Related document:1 Complaint.(Schlachet, Mark) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/02 6:01 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Beth Golden served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019; Weight Loss Products, LLC served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chaim Rubinstein. (Schlachet, Mark) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/29 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Removal of Plaintiff from ECF Service List. Document filed by Chaim Rubinstein. (Schlachet, Mark) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/26 2:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beth Golden, Weight Loss Products, LLC. (dnh) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/25 11:17 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Weight Loss Products, LLC and Beth Golden, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Chaim Rubinstein. (Schlachet, Mark) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 04/25 10:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Schlachet. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Chaim Rubinstein; Beth Golden. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/25 10:49 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/25 10:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/25 10:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/25 10:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mark Schlachet to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on 'as to' docket entry text does not exactly match initial pleading caption; Court name is not on the PDF; the PDF caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption; each summons request must be filed separately OR all party names may be on one PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/24 11:21 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Weight Loss Products, LLC and Beth Golden, Ph.D, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by CHAIM RUBINSTEIN.(Schlachet, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Summons #2 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/24 11:00 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schlachet, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Beth Golden, Weight Loss Products, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16754323)Document filed by CHAIM RUBINSTEIN.(Schlachet, Mark) |