National Rifle Association of America et al v. CITY OF LOS ANGELES et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-03212 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2019 1:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
City Clerk of Los Angeles
|
|
Defendant
Eric Garcetti
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Holly Wolcott
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Rifle Association of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
65 | 65
order
Amend/Correct
Fri 10/30 12:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES52 , GRANTING APPLICATION FOR COSTS51 AND GRANTING MOTION TO CORRECT ORDER61 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. For the reasons articulated above, the Court GRANTS IN PART Plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees in the reduced amount of $143,160.74. The Court GRANTS the City's motion to correct its order to reflect the parties' stipulation regarding costs. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' application for costs in the amount of $244.65. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS). (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
64 | 64
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 10/29 5:46 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re:61 MOTION to Correct Order on Application to Clerk to Tax Costs Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 11/02/2020 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |