Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists v. Oscar Gold Productions, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-03730 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts) |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2019 1:31 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Oscar Gold Productions, Inc.
1809 W. Magnolia Blvd.
Burbank, CA 91506 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, August 30, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Errata
Mon 08/30 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. correcting Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form,24 , Satisfaction of Judgment,22 (Kokish, Iris) |
|
Friday, August 27, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Fri 08/27 3:13 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Petitioner's Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed 8/24/202122 . The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 8/30/2021. (gk) |
|
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 08/26 1:13 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Satisfaction of Judgment,22 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing is prepared on a state court form. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, August 24, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Tue 08/24 12:24 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re Judgment,,,,,10 entered In favor of Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists Against Oscar Gold Productions, Inc. filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Judgment Debtor Exam
Tue 02/11 10:38 AM
MINUTES OF Judgment Debtor Exam held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Case called and the parties state their appearances. Debtor Askanaz Akopyan is placed under oath. The parties adjourn to conduct the judgment debtor examination. Court Recorder: CS 2/11/2020. (vm) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 01/29 10:39 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Order,, Set/Reset Hearing,19 served on January 29, 2020. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 12/19 3:16 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Application and Order for Appearance and Examination (CV4p),17 served on December 19, 2019. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 12/20 3:08 PM
AMENDED ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR RE: ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, amending17 Order to Appear for Examination of Judgment Debtor Re: Enforcement of Judgment. Judgment Debtor Exam of Oscar Gold Productions, Inc. set for 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
17 | 17
order
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination (CV4p)
Wed 12/18 2:42 PM
ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR RE: ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting12 APPLICATION to Enforce Judgment. Judgment Debtor Exam of Oscar Gold Productions, Inc. set for 2/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 12/17 8:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Counsel has failed to provide the courtesy copy pursuant to the Judge's Procedures and Schedules (http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-alka-sagar). Counsel is ordered to submit the required courtesy copy by no later than 12:00 p.m. on December 18, 2019. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.2, counsel for plaintiff(s) shall immediately submit the proposed order in connection with Docket Entry12 (to the Judge's generic email address) in Word or Word Perfect format. re: APPLICATION to Enforce Judgment 12 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Fri 12/13 11:54 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Application for Appearance & Examination12 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)14 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The hearing set for January 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before District Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. is hereby VACATED. Counsel is directed to submit the proposed order via e-mail to Judge Sagar's Chambers at: AS_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov in Word or Word Perfect version. (hr) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 12/13 11:52 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Application for Appearance & Examination12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely; Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Application --> Judgment Debtor Exam. Other error(s) with document(s): Per General Order 05-07, Discovery-related matters shall be noticed to and served courtesy copies to the assigned Magistrate Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr) Modified on 12/13/2019 (hr) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 12/12 1:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re APPLICATION to Enforce Judgment 12 served on December 12, 2019. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Enforce Judgment
Thu 12/12 11:00 AM
APPLICATION to Enforce Judgment filed by plaintiff Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. Application set for hearing on 1/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 06/06 4:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Judgment,,,,,10 served on June 6, 2019. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
10 | 10
judgmentCV
Judgment
Thu 06/06 2:13 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that judgment be entered in this case as follows: The arbitration award in favor of Petitioner Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, as successor-in-interest to Screen Actors Guild, Inc., ("SAG-AFTRA") and against Respondent Oscar Gold Productions, Inc., Union Case No. 11424, dated November 8, 2018, is confirmed in all respects. Respondents are ordered to pay as follows: (a) To Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, on behalf of affected performers, the sum of $257,222.27; (b) To Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists for its attorney's fees incurred in this action, the sum of $2,400.00; and (c) To Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists for its costs incurred in this action, the sum of $400.00. Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists is hereby granted an assignment of Respondents' accounts receivable from the distribution, exhibition, exploitation or other use of the motion picture entitled "Vigilante Diaries" anywhere in the world until the amounts due are paid in full. The parties are to split any arbitrator fees. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 05/07 1:31 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Text Only Notice (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on May 7, 2019. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 05/07 12:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 served on May 1, 2019. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 05/06 3:45 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
textonly
Text Only Notice (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 05/03 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion For Order Confirming Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 is set for hearing. Set for hearing on 6/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 05/03 9:56 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 05/03 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 05/01 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, (Kokish, Iris) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 05/01 2:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 05/01 2:11 PM
MOTION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF IRIS R. KOKISH IN SUPPORT THEREOF Receipt No: 0973-23656199 - Fee: $400, filed by petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Attorney Iris R Kokish added to party Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists(pty:pet))(Kokish, Iris) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment |