EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION v. CORPORACION CIMEX S.A. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01277 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2019 |
Case in other court: | 21-07127 22-07019 22-07020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 29, 2019 5:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
UNION CUBA-PETROLEO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CORPORACION CIMEX S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago |
Thursday, February 24, 2022 | ||
84 | 84
appeal
Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
Thu 02/24 11:26 AM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees ;USCA Case Number 22-7019 (zeg) |
|
Friday, February 18, 2022 | ||
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees
Thu 02/24 11:16 AM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 201600 re 79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by CORPORACION CIMEX S.A., UNION CUBA-PETROLEO (zeg) |
||
Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
83 | 83
appeal
Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
Thu 02/17 4:17 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 81 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Payment of Fee - Notice of Appeal ; (zeg) |
|
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 02/22 2:49 PM
USCA Case Number 22-7019 for 79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by CORPORACION CIMEX S.A., UNION CUBA-PETROLEO. (zeg) |
||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 02/22 3:13 PM
USCA Case Number 22-7020 for 81 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (zeg) |