Rubel v. Union Bank of California, N.A.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey T Miller |
Referred: | William V Gallo |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-00375 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2014 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2014 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 09, 2014 12:13 AM PST |
Defendant
Union Bank of California, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Rubel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, November 14, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 ORDER Granting20 Joint Motion to Dismiss. The case is dismissed with prejudice as to all individual claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant, and without prejudice as to any class claims. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/14/14. (rlu)(jrd) | |
Wednesday, November 12, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 MINUTE ORDER: the Settlement Disposition Conference set for 11/20/2014, at 10:00 AM, is hereby Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/12/14.(rlu) | |
20 | 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Ryan Rubel. (Campion, Douglas) (rlu). | |
Tuesday, October 21, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 MINUTE ORDER: On 10/21/2014, this Court held a telephonic Status Conference: A Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference is set for 11/20/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. If parties submit a joint motion for dismissal on or before 11/19/2014, however, the Settlement Disposition Conference set for 11/20/2014, will be automatically Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/21/2014.(rlu) | |
Monday, October 20, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 NOTICE of Settlement by Ryan Rubel (Trenz, Brian) (rlu). | |
Friday, October 17, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 MINUTE ORDER: The Early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for 10/21/2014, at 10:00 AM, is therefore Vacated. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/21/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/17/2014.(rlu) | |
Monday, September 15, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 PRO HAC APPROVED: David P Schafer appearing for Plaintiff Ryan Rubel (no document attached) (ag) | |
Friday, September 12, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER Granting Parties'14 Joint Motion to Continue Further Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The ENE Conference set for 9/15/2014, at 2:00 PM, is hereby Vacated and continued to 10/21/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/12/2014. (rlu) | |
14 | 14 Joint MOTION to Continue Further ENE Hearing Date by Ryan Rubel. (Campion, Douglas) (rlu). | |
Wednesday, September 10, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Schafer, David) (ag). | |
Tuesday, September 09, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-7363717.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Schafer, David) Modified on 9/10/2014 to note that atty will refile this application with all required signatures (ag). | |
Thursday, August 14, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/14/2014(no document attached) (mtb) | |
10 | 10 ORDER AFTER EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERENCE: Further Early Neutral Evaluation will be held 9/15/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/14/2014.(av1) | |
Thursday, June 05, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Amended notice and order for Early Neutral Evaluation:( Early Neutral Evaluation continued to 8/14/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo, United States Courthouse, Courtroom 2A, SecondFloor, 221 West Broadway, San Diego, California. The ENEset for August 4, 2014 at 9:00 AM is vacated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/5/14.(av1) (Entered: 06/05/2014) | |
Tuesday, May 27, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/27/14.(av1) | |
Friday, May 23, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Bank of California, N.A.. (Bluth, Andrew) (av1). | |
6 | 6 ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Union Bank of California, N.A..(Bluth, Andrew) (av1). | |
Monday, May 05, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Brian J. Trenz appearing for Plaintiff Ryan Rubel (jao) | |
Friday, April 18, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER granting3 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Defendant Union Bank of California, N.A. must file responsive pleading by 5/23/2014. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/18/2014. (jah) | |
Thursday, April 17, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to1 Complaint, by Union Bank of California, N.A.. (Bluth, Andrew). Attorney Andrew Daniel Bluth added to party Union Bank of California, N.A.(pty:dft). Modified on 4/18/2014 - Wrong motion event. Corrected entry (jah). | |
Wednesday, February 19, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Union Bank of California, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-6777409.), filed by Ryan Rubel. The new case number is 3:14-cv-00375-JM-WVG. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Campion, Douglas)(cxl) (av1). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |