Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-10998

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:19-bk-10993
Case Filed:May 06, 2019
Terminated:Mar 29, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors25,001-50,000
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
New LifeCare Hospitals of Milwaukee LLC
5340 Legacy Dr Ste 150
Plano, TX 75024-3131
Represented By
Betsy Lee Feldman
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Monday, March 29, 2021
5 5 order Final Decree Mon 03/29 8:55 AM
Final Decree Closing Certain Cases and Amending Caption of Remaining Case Signed on 3/26/2021 (LCN)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 03/29 9:19 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 07/02 4:02 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by New LifeCare Hospitals of Milwaukee LLC. (Luton Chapman, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SOFA
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 05/08 3:12 PM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Hospital Acquisition LLC, Hospital Acquisition Intermediate Sub LLC, LifeCare Holdings LLC (f/k/a Hospital Acquisition Sub I LLC), LifeCare Behavioral Health Hospital of Pittsburgh LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Dayton LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Milwaukee LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of South Texas LLC, Hospital Acquisition Sub II LLC, New LifeCare Management Services LLC, New LifeCare REIT 1 LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Mechanicsburg LLC, New Pittsburgh Specialty Hospital LLC, LifeCare Vascular Services, LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of North Texas LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Chester County LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Northern Nevada LLC, New Can Antonio Specialty Hospital LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of North Carolina LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Pittsburgh LLC, New NextCare Specialty Hospital of Denver LLC, Hospital Acquisition MI LLC, Life Care Pharmacy Services LLC, New LifeCare REIT 2 LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals at Tenaya LLC and New LifeCare Hospitals of Sarasota LLC. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Hospital Acquisition LLC, Case No. 19-10998 (BLS), should be consulted for all matters concerning this case. Signed on 5/8/2019 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/07 9:32 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-10993 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9297093, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Tue 05/07 7:57 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (LB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
1 1 22 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 05/06 11:40 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by New LifeCare Hospitals of Milwaukee LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 06/5/2019 (Feldman, Betsy)
Related: [-]