Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:19-bk-10998
Case Filed:May 06, 2019
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Plan Confirmed:Jan 15, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors25,001-50,000
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Hospital Acquisition LLC
5340 Legacy Dr Ste 150
Plano, TX 75024-3131
Represented By
M. Blake Cleary
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801

GPO Dec 21 2020
Opinion Regarding LifeCare 2.0, LLC's (I) Motion to Enforce Terms of Sale Order and for Specific Performance of Debtors' Objections Under Asset Purchase Agreement, and/or (II) Application for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)1059) (JMW)

1. LifeCare Hospitals file for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (bizjournals.com)
Submitted Thu 05/09/2019
Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Monday, January 13, 2025
1634 1634 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Mon 01/13 10:01 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 Filed by Liquidating Trustee. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 01/10 10:37 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
1633 1633 claims Claims Register Tue 01/07 5:16 PM
Final Claims Register (Alpha) . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (Numeric) Final Claims Register