Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:19-bk-11047
Case Filed:May 10, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Dec 05, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cloud Peak Energy Inc.
385 Interlocken Cres Ste 400
Broomfield, CO 80021-3561
Represented By
Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


1. Cloud Peak Energy voluntarily files for Chapter 11 » Kallanish Energy News (kallanishenergy.com)
Submitted Tue 05/14/2019
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
1325 1325 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Mon 05/12 12:40 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Engels Medina Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 6, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. (ET) . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 1324