FREEDOM WATCH, INC. v. MCALEENAN
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Rudolph Contreras |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01374 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2019 3:17 AM EST |
Defendant
KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FREEDOM WATCH, INC.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 26 2020
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 5 Defendant's motion to dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 26, 2020. (lcrc3) |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
30+
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 02/26 11:01 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting5 Defendant's motion to dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 26, 2020. (lcrc3) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 02/26 11:00 AM
ORDER granting5 Defendant's motion to dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 26, 2020. (lcrc3) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 10/21 10:40 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by KEVIN K. MCALEENAN. (Parascandola, Christina) Modified on 10/21/2019 to correct filing date (jf) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 10/02 12:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by KEVIN K. MCALEENAN(Parascandola, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 10/02 2:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file his reply to5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before October 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 2, 2019. (lcrc3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/02 3:44 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 10/18/2019. (tj) |
||
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to motion
Tue 09/03 12:56 PM
RESPONSE re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Klayman, Larry) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/22 5:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Klayman, Larry) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/22 7:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting7 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any response to5 Defendant's motion to dismiss by September 3, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file any reply thereto by October 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 22, 2019. (lcrc3) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 08/05 10:32 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/23/2019; Replies due by 9/13/2019. (tj) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/02 1:23 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Klayman, Larry) |
|
order
.Order
Fri 08/02 3:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any response to5 Defendant's motion to dismiss by August 23, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file any reply by September 13, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 2, 2019. (lcrc3) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 07/19 1:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by KEVIN K. MCALEENAN(Parascandola, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/28 7:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Parascandola on behalf of KEVIN K. MCALEENAN (Parascandola, Christina) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/28 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Abbott Kisor on behalf of KEVIN K. MCALEENAN (Kisor, Colin) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 05/14 11:54 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to KEVIN K. MCALEENAN.(zef, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 05/14 11:52 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) |
||
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/13 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6119359) filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC..(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |