7
|
|
7
orddiscp
Disciplinary Order
Fri 08/09 1:04 PM
ORDER OF RECIPROCAL DISCIPLINE temporarily suspending Respondent until such time as Respondent is reinstated to practice in the State of New Jersey. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/9/2019. (decs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
corresp
Disciplinary Document
Mon 07/01 4:15 PM
CORRESPONDENCE sent to Respondent on July 1, 2019 (decs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
corresp
Disciplinary Document
Wed 06/26 2:31 PM
CORRESPONDENCE received from Respondent on 6/25/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
corresp
Disciplinary Document
Tue 06/18 2:27 PM
RESPONSE to Show Cause Order filed by Respondent on 6/18/19 (decs, Deputy Clerk) (decs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(6/18/2019) Sealed Exhibit
|
3
|
|
3
corresp
Disciplinary Document
Mon 05/20 3:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, certified, return receipt card returned, signed and dated for Respondent on 5/17/2019.(srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
orddiscp
Disciplinary Order
Wed 05/15 11:19 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within thirty (30) days after mailing of this Order, why this Court should not impose the identical, greater, or lesser discipline as imposed by the Supreme Court of New Jersey. (c/m certified, return receipt requested #7018 2290 0000 8965 7013). Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 05/14/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
notice
Notice of Reciprocal Disciplinary Action
Mon 05/13 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF DISCIPLINARY ACTION by the Supreme Court of New Jersey as to Athanasios Tsimpedes. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
|