Neal v. PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Alistair Newbern |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00398 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2019 2:40 AM CST |
Defendant
PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deanna Neal
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 02/10 11:31 AM
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It appearing to the Court, as evidenced by the signature of counsel below, that all matters in dispute between the parties have been resolved, and that Plaintiff's Complaint should be dismissed with prejudice. Accordingly, It is hereby ordered that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/10/2021. (jm) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Proposed Order of Dismissal
Tue 02/09 3:57 PM
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AGREED, WITH PREJUDICE filed by PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC. (Leathers, H.) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 10/15 4:10 PM
ORDER: The parties jointly request extension of the dispositive motion deadline to November 2, 2020, in order to facilitate a mediation scheduled on October 26, 2020 (Doc. No.22 ). The motion is GRANTED IN PART as follows: The dispositive motion deadline is EXTENDED to November 2, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 10/15 10:32 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order by PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC. (Leathers, H.) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 08/13 2:21 PM
ORDER granting20 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order by Extending the Dispositive Motion Deadline. Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order by Extending the Dispositive Motion Deadline. (Doc. No. 20). Through the Motion, the parties seek to extend the dispositive motion deadline to October 19, 2020, so that they can pursue mediation without incurring the expense of preparing dispositive motions. The Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the case management order (Doc. No. 18) is amended to extend the deadline for the filing of dispositive motions from August 20, 2020, to October 19, 2020. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/13/2020. (am) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 08/11 3:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC. (Leathers, H.) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
order
Order Setting Case for Trial
Tue 04/21 2:14 PM
ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/2/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Exhibit List due by 2/15/2021. Witness List due by 2/15/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2021. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 04/20 2:29 PM
ORDER: In consultation with Judge Campbell's chambers, Motion to Modify Case Management Order and to Reschedule Trial17 is GRANTED IN PART. The discovery, expert discovery, and dispositive motion deadlines are EXTENDED as requested by the parties. The resetting of the trial date will be addressed by Judge Campbell in a separate order. The amended target trial date is February 23, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/20/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 04/16 3:15 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct /Modify Case Management Order and Reschedule Trial by PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC. (Leathers, H.) |
|
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/10 11:13 AM
ORDER - The Magistrate Judge held a telephonic case management conference with counsel for the parties on March 9, 2020. Counsel report that the case is progressing according to the deadlines set by the initial case management order. All case deadlines and the trial date therefore remain as previously established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/9/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (bs) |
|
minutes
Case Management Conference by Telephone
Tue 03/10 10:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 3/9/2020. (Hearing lasted :08)(tm) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
order
Order Setting Case for Trial
Thu 08/01 10:15 AM
ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/17/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2020. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 11/2/2020. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/1/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jw) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Case Management Order
Tue 07/30 5:51 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 4/17/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/22/2020. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/9/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/30/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jw) |
|
minutes
Case Management Conference
Tue 07/30 11:20 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/30/2019. (Hearing lasted :16)(tm) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Case Management Order
Thu 07/25 2:07 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (INITIAL) filed by PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC. (Leathers, H.) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 07/17 4:18 PM
ORDER: The initial case management conference is RESET to July 30, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall file a joint proposed initial case management order no later than three days before the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/17/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jw) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 07/16 3:09 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Continue. By no later than July 19, 2019, Plaintiff's counsel shall confer with Defendant's counsel and the Magistrate Judge's chambers to determine a mutually convenient date and time within three weeks of the original conference date to reset the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Continue
Tue 07/16 11:55 AM
MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Deanna Neal. (Knox, Kerry) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Fri 06/28 7:54 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for H. Rowan Leathers, III. (jw) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/27 4:33 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC. (Leathers, H.) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/27 4:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC.(Leathers, H.) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/29 3:10 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Deanna Neal. PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC served on 5/24/2019. (Knox, Kerry) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/16 3:51 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/16/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jw) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Wed 05/15 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/15 4:26 PM
Summons issued as to PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Wed 05/15 3:33 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Wed 05/15 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 05/15 3:33 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Kerry E. Knox. (jw) |
||
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/15 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT against PFTN Murfreesboro South, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2912904), filed by Deanna Neal.(jw) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |