Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:James L Graham
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:19-cv-01999
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:May 16, 2019
Terminated:Dec 17, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2019 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
Seale A. Moorer, Jr.
1755 Riverstone Dr.
Delaware, OH 43015
Defendant
Gate Worldwide Holdings LLC
28 Liberty St.
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Joseph L. Clasen
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Jeffrey A Willis
Willis The Firm Legal Services, LLC
contact info
Ian T. Clarke-Fisher
Chrysler East Building
contact info
Defendant
Intertouch PTE LTD
Defendant
Nomadix Inc.
30851 Agoura Rd. Ste 102
Agoura, CA 91301
Represented By
Joseph L. Clasen
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Jeffrey A Willis
Willis The Firm Legal Services, LLC
contact info
Ian T. Clarke-Fisher
Chrysler East Building
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael McCarron
6105 S. Venita Cir
Sioux Falls, SD 57108
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Darrin Ullerick
11850 Freedom Dr. Apt. 510
Reston, VA 20190
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rick Swift
125 Boonsboro Dr.
Lynchburg, VA 24503
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chris Shepard
2152 J Bird
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Neil Schubert
970 Keekle Lane SE
Leland, NC 28451
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shane Pierce
12 Wiltshire Blvd.
Laurel, MI 39443
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamie Nuebel
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Albert Nels
897 Winesap Dr.
Beavercreek, OH 45434
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Naro
4 E. Twin Oaks Estates
Sioux Fall, SD 57105
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Larivee
5817 W. Nancy St.
Sioux Falls, SD 57106
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Helen Koliner
4800 S. Caraway Cir.
Sioux Falls, SD 57108
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Colin Brent Jenkins
4800 S. Caraway Cir
Sioux Falls, SD 57108
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeannie Heffner
5754 Privilege Dr.
Hilliard, OH 43026
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean Dolan
4422 S. 8th St.
Tacoma, WA 98405
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Akesson
1310 E. Ocean Blvd. Unit 1505
Long Beach, CA 90802
Represented By
Edward Reilley Forman
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
Helen M. Robinson
Marshall And Forman
contact info
Louis Abraham Jacobs
Marshall And Morrow LLC
contact info
Samuel Micah Schlein
Marshall And Forman LLC
contact info
John Spenceley Marshall
Marshall And Forman, LLC
contact info

GPO Dec 17 2020
OPINION AND ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 12/17/2020. (ds)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 17, 2020
27 27 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 12/17 1:47 PM
OPINION AND ORDER granting11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 12/17/2020. (ds)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
26 26 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/27 11:50 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Helen Koliner. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
25 25 2 pgs order Order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Tue 12/17 5:00 PM
ORDER - With agreement of counsel for Defendants Gate Worldwide Holdings (GWH) and Nomadix Inc. (Nomadix) who have made an appearance, will file an entry dismissing these Defendants without prejudice by DECEMBER 27, 2019. discovery in this case is STAYED pending a decision on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 17, 2019. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
24 24 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 12/09 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/17/2019 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
23 23 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 11/21 2:53 PM
ORDER - Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 days why the claims against Defendants Seale A. Moorer, Jr. and Intertouch PTE LTD should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Show Cause Response due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 21, 2019. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2019
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/19 10:18 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Gate Worldwide Holdings LLC & Nomadix Inc. (Willis, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/05 9:48 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Scott Akesson, Sean Dolan, Jeannie Heffner, Colin Brent Jenkins, Helen Koliner, David Larivee, Michael McCarron, James Naro, Albert Nels, Jamie Nuebel, Shane Pierce, Neil Schubert, Chris Shepard, Rick Swift, Darrin Ullerick. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/05 8:19 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re18 Response in Opposition to Motion: The Response does not comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a) (kk2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/05 8:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 9/19/2019 (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 09/04 1:06 PM
ORDER granting16 Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process. Plaintiff must effect service of process on Intertouch PTE LTD within SEVENTY (70) DAYS of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/4/19. (sem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/03 3:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Scott Akesson, Sean Dolan, Jeannie Heffner, Colin Brent Jenkins, Helen Koliner, David Larivee, Michael McCarron, James Naro, Albert Nels, Jamie Nuebel, Shane Pierce, Neil Schubert, Chris Shepard, Rick Swift, Darrin Ullerick. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued Tue 09/03 9:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Intertouch PTE LTD (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
16 16 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 08/30 12:22 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Helen Koliner. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/30 11:26 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
14 14 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 08/22 5:05 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the action should not be dismissed as to Defendant Intertouch PTE LTD and why an extension of time to effect service should be allowed. Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 22, 2019. (jlk)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 08/22 5:03 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall have until NOVEMBER 20, 2019 by which to effect service upon Defendant Seale A. Moorer, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 22, 2019. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
12 12 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/21 2:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/18/2019. by Plaintiffs Scott Akesson, Sean Dolan, Jeannie Heffner, Colin Brent Jenkins, Helen Koliner, David Larivee, Michael McCarron, James Naro, Albert Nels, Jamie Nuebel, Shane Pierce, Neil Schubert, Chris Shepard, Rick Swift, Darrin Ullerick. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/12 2:51 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Nomadix Inc. & Gate Worldwide Holdings LLC (Willis, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/13/2019 to correct filing parties (kk2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/12 2:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Nomadix Inc. (Willis, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/12 2:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gate Worldwide Holdings LLC. (Willis, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2019
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/18 9:30 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph L Clasen & Ian T Clarke-Fisher by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/18/2019 (kk2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 07/18 9:10 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Gate Worldwide Holdings LLC & Nomadix Inc. answers due 8/12/2019 per6 (Stipulation) (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
7 7 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/17 3:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-7014767) of Joseph L. Clasen; Ian T. Clarke-Fisher by Defendants Gate Worldwide Holdings LLC, Nomadix Inc.. (Willis, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 07/17 3:23 PM
STIPULATION Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Defendants Gate Worldwide Holdings LLC, Nomadix Inc.. (Willis, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 06/28 10:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 06/28 10:18 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/01 8:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Nomadix Inc. on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. SEE DOCKET # 4 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to enter the service and answer due dates, which were not input when the document was originally filed. (kk2)
Related: [-]
service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/01 8:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Gate Worldwide Holdings LLC on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. SEE DOCKET # 5 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to enter the service and answer due dates, which were not input when the document was originally filed. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 05/21 3:55 PM
Summons Issued as to Seale A. Morrer, Jr. (er)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/20 10:19 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/16 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6928229), filed by Helen Koliner. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet