In re Lyft Inc. Securities Litigation
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Haywood S Gilliam, Jr |
Referred: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 4:19-cv-02690 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | May 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 13, 2019 12:57 AM PST |
Defendant
Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lyft, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hiroshi Mikitani
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mischler Financial Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ann Miura-Ko
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Penserra Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Piper Jaffray & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
R. Seelaus & Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RBC Capital Markets, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Academy Securities, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tigress Financial Partners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Zimmer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Lawee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Blaylock Van, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C.L. King & Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Canaccord Genuity LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Castleoak Securities, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jonathan Christodoro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cowen and Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Drexel Hamilton, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Evercore Group L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Great Pacific Securities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ben Horowitz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Loop Capital Markets, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KKR Capital Markets, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jefferies LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Valerie Jarrett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JMP Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Logan Green
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Terry S. Bradford
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Rick Keiner
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Rakesh Khanna
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Danilo Nunez
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Deep Dinesh Patel
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Harold Tholen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matias Malig, as Trustee for the Malig Family Trust, CA
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lyft Gets Hit With Class-Action Investor Lawsuit (pymnts.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/22/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
396 | 396
order
Judgment Terminate Civil Case
Mon 09/11 9:48 AM
JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/11/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
395 | 395
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 09/08 1:38 PM
Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment by Rick Keiner. (Walker, Jacob) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
394 | 394
order
Order
Tue 09/05 2:36 PM
ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. re: Dkt. No. 393 Proposed Stipulated Final Judgment. The parties' proposed order appears to track an older judgment the Court entered in Fleming v. Impax Labs., Case No. 16-cv-06557. However, the Court does not intend to re-use this format because it, for example, includes factual findings not warranted or necessary in a judgment. Instead, the parties are DIRECTED to submit a revised proposed Final Judgment by September 12, 2023, that tracks the more streamlined format in Vataj v. Johnson, Case No. 19-cv-06996 and In Re Aqua Materials, Inc. Sec. Litig., Case No. 17-cv-07142. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3, COURT STAFF) |