State of New York et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-04676 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2019 4:03 AM EST |
ADR Provider
Scholars of the LGBT Population
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American College of Pediatricians
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The American Medical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
the American Academy of Pediatrics
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
the American College of Emergency Physicians
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
the American College of Nurse-Midwives
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
the American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
the American College of Osteopathic Obstetricians and Gynecologists
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
the American Muslim Health Professionals
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
the National Association of Nurse Practitioners in Womens Health
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
the North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
the Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Center for Law and Justice
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
, the American Society for Reproductive Medicine
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Callen Lorde Community Health Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Care Resource Community Health Centers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Catholic Medical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
City of Columbus
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Howard Brown Health
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Legacy Community Health Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Catholic Bioethics Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Center for Lesbian Rights
870 Market Street Suite 370
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
National LGBTQ Task Force
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The National LGBT Cancer Network
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
the World Professional Association for Transgender Health
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Institute for Policy Integrity
New York University School of Law 139 Macdougal St
NY, NY 10012 |
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
Office for Civil Rights
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
Office for Civil Rights of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
Roger Severino
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
National Family Planning and Reproductive Health Association
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood of Northern New England, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Public Health Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alex M. Azar II
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Regina Frost
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christian Medical and Dental Association
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Christian Medical and Dental Associations
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Dr. Regina Renee Frost
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District of Columbia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Michigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Minnesota
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Nevada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Chicago
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New Jersey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cook County, Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New Mexico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Rhode Island
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Vermont
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Wisconsin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Hawaii
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Colorado
|
Represented By
|
1. | Mass. AG Healey Joins Lawsuit Against Rule Allowing Clinicians To Refuse Abortions (boston.cbslocal.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/22/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
285 | 285
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 03/21 1:56 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (129 in 1:19-cv-05435-PAE) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Roger Severino, Office for Civil Rights of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M. Azar, II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, (127 in 1:19-cv-05435-PAE, 254 in 1:19-cv-04676-PAE, 121 in 1:19-cv-05433-PAE) Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Regina Renee Frost, Christian Medical and Dental Associations, (123 in 1:19-cv-05433-PAE) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Alex M. Azar II, Roger Severino, Office for Civil Rights, United States Department of Health And Human Services, (255 in 1:19-cv-04676-PAE) Notice of Appeal,,, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services, Office for Civil Rights of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M. Azar II, Office for Civil Rights, United States of America, Roger Severino. USCA Case Number 19-4254 20-31, 20-32, 20-41. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing these appeals pursuant to Local Rule 42.1. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered".. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 03/21/2024. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-04676-PAE, 1:19-cv-05433-PAE, 1:19-cv-05435-PAE.(nd) |