Texas Pacific Land Trust et al v. Oliver
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01224 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2019 2:15 AM CST |
Counter Claimant
ART-FGT Family Partners Limited
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Horizon Kinetics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Eric L Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
SoftVest LP
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
David E Barry
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
John R Norris, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric L Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David E Barry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John R Norris, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Texas Pacific Land Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
63 | 63
order
Order
Wed 07/31 9:29 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties have settled this case. Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal (Doc. 61) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, all claims and counterclaims in this case are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court will retain exclusive jurisdiction over the parties for the purposes of enforcing the settlement agreement. The Court directs the clerk to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/31/2019) (chmb) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Wed 07/31 9:52 AM
Civil Case Terminated per 63 Electronic Order. (axm) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
62 | 62
4
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Tue 07/30 11:08 PM
Agreed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without Prejudice by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust. (Ostolaza, Yvette) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
61 | 61
14
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Fri 07/26 3:39 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting54 Motion for Limited Discovery Related to Counter-Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction Motion. The stay of discovery under the PSLRA is partially lifted for the limited purpose of allowing Plaintiffs to pursue the discovery discussed in their motion and granted herein. For all other purposes, the discovery stay remains in place until the Court rules on the Counterclaim Plaintiffs' motion for judgment on the pleadings. Counterclaim Plaintiffs are ORDERED to respond to Plaintiffs' discovery requests listed in Exhibit 1 to their motion by 8/1/2019. Any privilege log shall be produced by 8/4/2019. Discovery shall be otherwise conducted and produced in accordance with the Court's 7/15/2019 Order (Doc. 53). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/26/2019) (zkc) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
60 | 60
respm
Appendix in Support
Thu 07/25 2:33 PM
Appendix in Support filed by David E Barry(solely in respective capacity as trustee for Texas Pacific Land Trust), John R Norris, III(solely in respective capacity as trustee for Texas Pacific Land Trust) re59 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,58 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Plaintiff's Amended Counterclaims (Ostolaza, Yvette) |
|
59 | 59
34
pgs
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Thu 07/25 2:28 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by David E Barry(solely in respective capacity as trustee for Texas Pacific Land Trust), John R Norris, III(solely in respective capacity as trustee for Texas Pacific Land Trust) re58 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Plaintiff's Amended Counterclaims (Ostolaza, Yvette) |
|
58 | 58
4
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/25 2:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Plaintiff's Amended Counterclaims filed by David E Barry(solely in respective capacity as trustee for Texas Pacific Land Trust), John R Norris, III(solely in respective capacity as trustee for Texas Pacific Land Trust) (Ostolaza, Yvette) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order |