In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation **COUNSEL: DO NOT ADD PARTIES.****Individual Plaintiffs/Defendants Will Not Appear on the Docket Sheet.**
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Julie A Robinson |
Referred: | Teresa J James |
Case #: | 2:19-md-02887 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1407 Multi-District Litigation |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2019 9:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Colgate-Palmolive Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
|
|
In Re
All Defendants (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY)
|
|
In Re
All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY)
|
|
In Re
Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation
|
|
Interested Party
Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Ana Alberto
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
William Albion
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sabrena Alvin
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kathy Amor
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Bruce Anderson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sherri Anderson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Nicole Anerino
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Ken Annarummo
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Yvonne Apelian
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Maria Avdelas
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Victoria Baldwin
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Tina Baleria
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lorene Banks
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Cheryl Barr
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sandra Bartholomew
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sylvia Barton
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Pandora Battles
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Ann Bauer
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Robbin Bazinet
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Vhenus Belisle
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Catherine Benefield
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Tanya Berg
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kelli Bice
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Elisa Bindus
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Michelle Black
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Scott Blanchard
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jack Blaser
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kelly Bone
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Eileen Bonfiglio
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Martin Boos
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Vickie Bosch
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Penny Bowers
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lashree Branch
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Paula Brewer
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Angel Brown
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Donald Brown
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Joseph W. Brown
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lisa Brown
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Barbara Brushett
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sheree Bryant
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Janine Buckley
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Brandon Bulger
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kimberly Burgess
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
John Burkett
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Krysten Bush
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Elizabeth Buteau
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
John Byrns
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Stacey Calcote
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Debra Cannata
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Freddy G. Carr
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Mary M. Carr
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Vicki Carty
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Saul Cervantes
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Amanda Chapman
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jana Chehouri
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Simmons Chhamboni
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Wesley Chung-A-on
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Deborah Ciferni
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Rhonda Clark
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Forrest Cleveland
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Terry Cloutier
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jill Cole
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Linda Cole
|
|
MDL - Notice Only
Stanley Conley
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Donna Connary
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Shirley Contreras
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kelli Coppi
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
David Costello
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kenyatta Cotton
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Keith Crawford
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Chanda Culley
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Yasser Daoudi
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Ada Darnell
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Robert Davenport
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jonathan Davis
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lashanta Davis
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Peggy Davis
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Darlene DeLaney
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Dion Delgado
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Benjamin Devine
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Donna Dillon
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jerels Dillon
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jessica Donovan
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Michael Donovan
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lula Draper
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sarah Ecton
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Loretta Eddie
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Tesha Ellis
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Ellen Embry
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jeanne Emmerman
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Theresa Erickson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Ulysses Esparza
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Joseph Esposito
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Diane Ethridge
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jamie Eyler
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Frank Favazza
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Michael Fay
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Melody Feld
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Samantha Ferguson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Joan Fields
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Bobbi Finch
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Janice Flanary
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kimbra Flanders
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Blair Fleites
|
|
MDL - Notice Only
Patsy Flinn
|
|
MDL - Notice Only
Donna Folbaum
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Linda Foster
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Laura Freeman
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Beatrice Friedman Pinones
|
|
MDL - Notice Only
Courtney Friend
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Maritza Galindo
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Brad Getz
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lynn Gibbs
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Thomas Gorham
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Colin Granger
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Keith Gren
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Carma Gruhlke
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Karen Guinen
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Norman Guinn
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Georgeanne Hall
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kathleen Hall
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sally Hall
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Brinitha Harris
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kevin Harris
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Stephanie Harrison
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Desiree Hassan
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Marc Haughaboo
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Robert Haviland
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Keith Heck
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Darcy Heidt
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Steve Hemphill
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Janis Henderson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Wendy Henry
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
David Hess
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Anthony Heysquierdo
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Iasha Hill
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sandra Hines-Cumberledge
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Robyn Hodnett
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Robert Hodsdon
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Julie Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Timothy Holden
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jessie Hollister
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sharon Hopkins
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Penny Hopson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Heidi Horne
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
David Howard
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Candice Howarth-Gadomski
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Randel Huff
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Alexander Hutchins
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Harold Infante
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Susanne Jacoby-Hale
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Linda Jarvis
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sharon Jespersen
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
David Johnson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kristina Johnson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Andrea Jones
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Anya Jones
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Deborah Jones
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Tim Jones
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Vincent Jones
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Judy Joyner
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jennifer Jubinville
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Michelene Judd
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Russell Kane
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lindsey Kang
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lisa Kannair
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jason Karr
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Cara Kaufmann
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Allison Kay
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kevin Kelly
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jany Kim
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Susan Kindregan
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Marla King
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Shawn King
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Linda Kinnard
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kathy Klaassen
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Betty Klein
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Vicki Klein
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Faye Knighten
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
TJ Knowland
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Karen Kolb
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lisette Kra
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Teresa Krage
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Matthew Krause
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
James Lambert
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Rosemary Lanctot
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jill Lanham
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Diana Larosa
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lisa Lavalle
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lori Lawhead
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lynette Lawrence-Kirk
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Tammy Lechner
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Betty Lee
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Nancy Lerner
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Dana Lewis
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Francesca Logan
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Mistie Loggins
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Rebecca Lovejoy
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
David Lovell
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Donald Lynch
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Bradley Mace
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Enrique Mancia
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sarah Mangrich
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sharon Manier
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Harriet Manoli
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Latonya Mark
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Leone Markham
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Michael Markiewicz
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kelly Matthews
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Tanya Matthews
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Joseph Mattocks
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Patricia Maxwell
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Stacey Mayes
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Nancy McAtee
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Diane McDaniel
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Patrick McDonald
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kenneth McGlothen
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Yolonda McGregor
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
John McIlvaine
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Cheryl McMurray
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Julia Medina
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Abraham Mejia
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Maria Mendez
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Giuseppe Merolla
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sylvia Miller
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Tiffany Miller
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Scott Molski
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Amanda Monita
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Dave Moody
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Erica Moreno
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Morgan Mosier
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kimberly Mull
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Brenda Myers
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jennifer Naeve
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
John Navarrete
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Robert Neve
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Linda Niday
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Patricia Niemann
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Liz O'Connell
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kelley O'Neill
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Steven Oakley
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Cliff Palifrone
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Alexander Patterson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jeff Pederson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lilly Perez
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Khanh Pham
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Alex Ponder
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Alice Poole
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Rada Popova
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Robin Prebe
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lorie Pritchard
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Rosalinda Quintero
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Angelena Raines
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Carole Reed
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Eliza Reid
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sarah Rhoten
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Billie Rice
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lekendra Richardson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sharon Rider
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Cheryl Riener
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Robert Riordan
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Karen Roach
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Vanessa Roberts
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Anthony Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Ashli Rogers
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Karen Rohrman
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Michael Rojas
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Carrie Roman
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lori Root
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Taakena Ross
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Luis Ruiz
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Debra Russell
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jodi Russell
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Michael Russell
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jenael Sahli
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Oscar Salazar
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Monique Salerno
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Doug Sannan
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Melissa Saturno
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Christine Sawyer
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Janet Schaefer
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Patricia Schmits-Weagly
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Elyssa Schneider
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Carol Schupp
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Tiffany Scott
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Karen Senour
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Erica Seterstrom
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lynn Shanley
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Amanda Sharkey
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sharon Shibley
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Samara Shofner
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Chuck Silveira
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Aaron Sizemore
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lee Skoog
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Andrea Smith
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jeff Snyder
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Tammy Snyder
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Donna Lee Soltis
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
William Spillers
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jenna Sprengel
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Karen Stanfield
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Robert Stapleton
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Lisa Steinberg
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Heather Stewart
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Donna Stordahl
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sarah Stroud
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Sheldon Sturges
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Brenda Summers
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jun Virginia Sun-Dampier
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Susan Tarrence
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Catherine Teegarden
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Theresa Terhark
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Veronica Thomas-Kowalak
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Erik Tipton
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Steven Tish
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Teresa Tolnay
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Demetrios Tsiptsis
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Ted Turnbough
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Jamie Turner
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Luann Tyborski
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Diane Tyson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kristine Valenti
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kayla Vanwinsen
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Kristina Vaughn
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Letonya Vaughn
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Tamara Vincent
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Joanna Viola
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Candace Wallace
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Bailee Walsh
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Laura Was
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Elizabeth Watson
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Danya Wedemier
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Suzanne Welch
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Debra Wells
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Joani Werner
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Barbara Wertman
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Chad Wheeler
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Diane Whitaker
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Deanna Williams
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Gina Wimsatt
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Woodson Wood, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Rachelle Wyse
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Michael Yesenko
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
John Yoo
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Robert Younger
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Betty Zambrano
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Michael Zinzer
|
Represented By
|
MDL - Notice Only
Christy Zisser
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
153 | 153
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/24 3:39 PM
ORDER re152 Status Report filed by All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY). Please see the order for details. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 07/24/2023. (gw) |