Broadway v. Johnson and Johnson Worldwide, et al
Original Case: 1:18-cv-09703
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01653 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2019 4:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson Worldwide Research Business Developmental Pharmaceutical Company
|
|
Defendant
Glaxo SmithKline Pharmacetical Worldwide Research
|
|
Defendant
(6) Other Companies Under McNeil Authorization to Marketing Worldwide
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
McNeil Consumer Healthcare Pharmaceutical, a Johnson and Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Glaxo SmithKline Pharmaceutical U.S.A./U.K
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Foundation Park
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Berkshire
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
McNeil Products Limited
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Roxborough Way
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Maidenhead
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
McNeil Consumer Healthcare Company, a Johnson and Johnson Company
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ellis Broadway, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/16/2019 4:29 AM EDT |
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ellis Broadway, Jr., FILED. [2580736] 19-1653 [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:07 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 70 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 05/20/2019, RECEIVED.[2580745] 19-1653 [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:09 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT CIVIL JUDGMENT, dated 05/20/2019, RECEIVED.[2580748] 19-1653 [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:10 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2580750] 19-1653 [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:11 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |