New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John P Mastando III
Case #: 1:19-bk-11911
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Aug 21, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
305 East 61st Street Group LLC
445 Park Ave, 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Robert J. Spence
Spence Law Office, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday May 06, 2020 12:27 PM EDT
Creditor
305 E 61st Street Lender LLC
Represented By
Robert Alan Abrams
Katsky Korins LLP
contact info
Steven H. Newman
Katsky Korins LLP
contact info
Creditor
Landmark Associates-2, LLC
377 Broadway 6th Floor
New York, NY 10013
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Chancas
Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins
contact info
Creditor
Acqua Ancien Bath New York, Inc.
Represented By
Alan D. Halperin
Halperin Battaglia Benzija, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Jason Carter
Zucker & Sharfstein, LLP 1201 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556
Represented By
Gerard Sylvester Catalanello
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Thomas Alan Draghi
Westerman Ball Ederer Miller
contact info
Interested Party
61 Prime, LLC
Represented By
Gerard Sylvester Catalanello
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Lazarus 5, LLC
Represented By
Gerard Sylvester Catalanello
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Trustee
Kenneth P Silverman
Represented By
Brian Powers
Silvermanacampora LLP
contact info
Ronald J. Friedman
Silvermanacampora LLP
contact info
Kenneth P. Silverman
Silverman Acampora LLP
contact info
Justin S. Krell
Silvermanacampora LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014
Unknown
Little Hearts Marks Family II, LP
360 Lexington Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Justin R. Bonanno
Ganfer & Shore, LLP
contact info
Michael J. Riela
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse Hirschtritt
contact info
Unknown
Thaddues Pollock
Represented By
Scott A. Weiss
Weiss & Weiss, LLC
contact info

GPO Nov 07 2022
Memorandum Of Decision Signed On 11/7/2022, Re: Creditor Trustee's Motion To Approve A Settlement Agreement Between The Creditor Trustee, 61 Prime, LLC, Jason Carter, and Lazarus 5, LLC (related document(s)280) (Ebanks, Liza)

Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
348 348 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Tue 04/15 1:12 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Brian Powers on behalf of Kenneth Silverman. (Powers, Brian)
Related: [-]