Johnson v. Progressive Corporation Insura
Original Case: 1:19-cv-02902
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01688 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 25, 2019 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Progressive Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert W. Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/25/2019 4:36 AM EDT |
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Robert W. Johnson, FILED. [2582729] 19-1688 [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:32 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 54 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2582732] 19-1688 [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:34 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2582734] 19-1688 [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:35 PM] |