Lennox v. Clarke
Original Case: 3:17-cv-00786
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01675 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 31, 2020 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Rodney V. Marsh, Individually and as Chief of Police of the City of Norwich
|
|
Defendant
City of Norwich, New York
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Thomas Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Brandon Clarke, individually and as a Police Officer of the City of Norwich, New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jessica A. Lennox, individually and as mother and natural guardian of A.L., an infant
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 29 2020
OPINION, affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding, by PWH, RJL, MHP, FILED.[2894803] [19-1675] |
Docket last updated: 07/31/2020 4:34 AM EDT |
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Brandon Clarke and Thomas Miller, FILED. [2582271] 19-1675 [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:35 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 25 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 05/17/2019, RECEIVED.[2582276] 19-1675 [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:41 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Brandon Clarke and Thomas Miller, district court receipt # ANYNDC-4761882, FILED.[2582280] 19-1675 [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:42 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2582283] 19-1675 [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:45 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |