Nunes Bey v. State of New York Queens Count
Original Case: 1:19-cv-02038
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01686 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2019 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Shapiro, DiCaro & Barak, LLC, Attorney 3rd Party Interloper
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe 2
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe 1
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Audrey Ipheffer, Acting Queens County Clerk
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Francis K. Kenna, Registration Number 4518197
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Alexander Phengsiaroun, Esq., Registration Number 4518197
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Stephanie Leonardo, Registration Number 4766226
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc., MERS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Franklin First Financial, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Federal National Mortgage Association, Fannie Mae
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Cheree A. Buggs, Registration Number 2124527
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
State of New York, Andrew Cuomo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
State of New York Queens County, Supreme Courts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sister Claudette Angela Nunes Bey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brother Ras Jai Bey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sister Laviena Nunes Bey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brother Isa Talib Chemeaux Bey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sister Constantina Ruby Lege Alba La'at Bey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/27/2019 4:28 AM EDT |
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sister Constantina Ruby Lege Alba La'at Bey in 19-1686 FILED. [2582711] 19-1686 19-1673 [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:22 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 4 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 05/01/2019, RECEIVED.[2582718] 19-1686 [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:27 PM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/02/2019, RECEIVED.[2582719] 19-1686 [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:28 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2582724] 19-1686 [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:29 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 NOTE: See lead case, 19-1673 containing complete set of docket entries.[2582726] 19-1686 [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:30 PM] |