Federal Grievance Committee v. Miller
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01676 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 20, 2020 4:36 AM EDT |
Petitioner - Appellee
Federal Grievance Committee
|
Represented By
|
Respondent - Appellant
Josephine Smalls Miller
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/20/2020 4:31 AM EDT |
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Josephine Smalls Miller, FILED. [2582328] 19-1676 [Entered: 06/07/2019 11:15 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Josephine Smalls Miller, district court receipt # CTXB00010266, FILED.[2582333] 19-1676 [Entered: 06/07/2019 11:16 AM] | |
3 | 3 8 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/10/2019, RECEIVED.[2582334] 19-1676 [Entered: 06/07/2019 11:17 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2582335] 19-1676 [Entered: 06/07/2019 11:17 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |