Express Mobile, Inc. v. e-Zest Solutions, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard Seeborg |
Referred: | Donna M Ryu |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-03351 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:145 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 10, 2019 12:46 AM PST |
Defendant
e-Zest Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Express Mobile, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 11/15 10:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 11/12 11:53 AM
STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/9/2020 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/19. (clS, COURT STAFF) |
|
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 11/12 11:50 AM
*** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 36 . *** STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/9/2020 AT 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/19. (clS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/12/2019 (clS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Continue
Fri 11/08 11:59 AM
MOTION to Continue Stay and Notice of Settlement filed by Express Mobile, Inc..(Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 10/09 8:08 AM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 32 Motion to Stay all Deadlines. (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Stay
Tue 10/08 12:26 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Responses due by 10/22/2019. Replies due by 10/29/2019.(Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 09/13 6:50 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/13/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/12/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
minutes
Case Management Conference - Initial
Thu 09/12 2:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/12/2019. Court to issue scheduling order. Total Time in Court: 20 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey Craft, Timothy Devlin - Telephonic. Defendant Attorney: Bailey Watkins, Neil Jones, William Overend, Lauren Deeb, Michael McNamara, Kevin Meek, Mike Adams - Telephonic. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2019) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 09/09 11:11 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 09/05 2:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by e-Zest Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent e-Zest Solutions Ltd. for e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (Guske, Sarah) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Thu 09/05 1:59 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
5
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/30 1:58 PM
Notice of Reference and ORDER Re: Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/30/2019. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) |
|
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/30 9:10 AM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy Devlin. (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/30 8:22 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Devlin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13663536.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 08/22 11:43 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
22 | 22
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 08/22 10:14 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Guske, Sarah) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
Mon 08/19 3:32 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery. (mklS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
Mon 08/19 2:17 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/16/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/06 10:25 AM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren Jarvis Dreyer. (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/06 10:22 AM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bailey Preston Morgan Watkins. (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/06 10:19 AM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin James Meek. (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 08/06 9:36 AM
Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (cl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 07/30 11:32 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled a Telephonic Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Chambers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 10:21 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13564078.) filed by e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (Lauren, Dreyer) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 10:11 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13564019.) filed by e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (Watkins, Bailey) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 10:08 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13563964.) filed by e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (Meek, Kevin) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/30 8:18 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor.(jmlS, COURT STAFF) | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) | |
4 | 4 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) | |
3 | 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding US 6,546,397 B1; US 7,594,168 B2; US 9,471,287 B2; US 9,928,044 B2 (cc: form mailed to register). (Craft, Jeffrey) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Craft, Jeffrey) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against e-Zest Solutions, Inc. with jury demand. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13433634.). Filed by Express Mobile, Inc..(Craft, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |