Express Mobile, Inc. v. e-Zest Solutions, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard Seeborg |
Referred: | Donna M Ryu |
Case #: | 4:19-cv-03351 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:145 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 10, 2019 12:17 AM PST |
Defendant
e-Zest Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Express Mobile, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order Relating Case
Mon 07/29 2:11 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE(s): C 17-2605 RS; C 19-3350 JSW; C 19-3351 YGR; C 19-3352 RS; C 19-3353 JST; C 19-3355 EJD; C 19-3356 EMC and C 19-3357 JST... Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/2019. (tlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/15 3:24 PM
NOTICE by e-Zest Solutions, Inc.(Guske, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A & B | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/15 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah JoAnn Guske (Guske, Sarah) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 07/05 10:09 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT 9 by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 04, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 07/04 6:18 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Express Mobile, Inc..(Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/27 11:57 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Express Mobile, Inc... (Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/20 1:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Express Mobile, Inc.. e-Zest Solutions, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 06/13 3:25 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor.(jmlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/13 3:23 PM
Summons Issued as to e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 06/13 12:55 PM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Thu 06/13 10:36 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding US 6,546,397 B1; US 7,594,168 B2; US 9,471,287 B2; US 9,928,044 B2 (cc: form mailed to register). (Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 06/13 10:35 AM
Proposed Summons. (Craft, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/13 10:34 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against e-Zest Solutions, Inc. with jury demand. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13433634.). Filed by Express Mobile, Inc..(Craft, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |