Yu v. Knighted, LLC
Original Case: 7:15-cv-09340
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01717 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 02, 2020 4:34 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Knighted, LLC, an Intelligrated Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Siji Yu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/02/2020 4:31 AM EDT |
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Siji Yu, FILED. [2585602] 19-1717 [Entered: 06/12/2019 03:28 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 16 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 22 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION & ORDER, dated 05/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2585605] 19-1717 [Entered: 06/12/2019 03:31 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2585607] 19-1717 [Entered: 06/12/2019 03:32 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2585609] 19-1717 [Entered: 06/12/2019 03:32 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 16 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2585610] 19-1717 [Entered: 06/12/2019 03:33 PM] |